EP3021292 - Proxy key, proxy reader and associated methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASSA ABLOY AB P.O. Box 70340 107 23 Stockholm / SE | [2016/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gustafsson, Niklas Storskogsvägen 3 141 39 Huddinge / SE | 02 /
Gärde, Johan Sofiebergsvägen 12 135 53 Tyresö / SE | 03 /
Persson, Johan Ringvägen 135 116 61 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
Cronfalk, Linnea Vintertullstorget 12 116 43 Stockholm / SE | 05 /
Strömberg, Stefan Sankt Göransgatan 98 112 45 Stockholm / SE | [2016/20] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2016/20] | Application number, filing date | 14193065.1 | 13.11.2014 | [2016/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3021292 | Date: | 18.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
G07C9/00857 (EP);
G07C9/00571 (EP);
G07C2009/0088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Proxy-Schlüssel, Proxy-Leser und zugehörige Verfahren | [2016/20] | English: | Proxy key, proxy reader and associated methods | [2016/20] | French: | Clé de proxy, lecteur de proxy et procédés associés | [2016/20] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2340642 (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [X] 1,3-9,11-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 7 - page 5, line 7 * * page 5, line 14 - page 9, line 18 * [I] 2,10; | [Y]EP0282339 (SECURITY SERVICES PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 52 * * column 2, line 62 - column 4, line 65 *; | [Y]EP2573738 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0040] *; | [A]US2006082434 (BREY THOMAS A [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0016] *; | [A]DE19753401 (MARQUARDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 52 * * page 4, line 29 - page 6, line 35 * |