EP2912995 - Method and apparatus for illuminating a field of view of an optical system for generating three dimensional image information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRONT STREET INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT INC. as manager for Front Street Diversified Income Class 33 Yonge Street, Suite 600 Toronto ON M5E 1G4 / CA | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitchell, Thomas N. RR No 1 L69, 1572 Eagle Cliff Road Bowen Island, British Columbia V0N 1G0 / CA | 02 /
Shinkoda, Ichiro 475 Dorman Road Bowen Island, British Columbia V0N 1G1 / CA | 03 /
Beckett, Martin 1256 Scarborough Road Bowen Island, British Columbia V0N 1G0 / CA | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | Hansson, Anders Max Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 14194640.0 | 08.09.2011 | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2912995 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/002 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
A61B1/00193 (EP,US);
A61B1/00194 (EP);
A61B1/002 (EP);
A61B1/0605 (EP);
A61B1/07 (EP);
G01B11/24 (EP);
G01B11/245 (EP);
G03B35/08 (EP);
G02B21/06 (EP);
G02B23/2461 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2015/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Beleuchtung eines Sichtfeldes eines optischen Systems zur Erzeugung von dreidimensionalen Bildinformationen | [2015/36] | English: | Method and apparatus for illuminating a field of view of an optical system for generating three dimensional image information | [2015/36] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour éclairer un champ de vision d'un système optique pour générer des informations d'image en trois dimensions | [2015/36] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 18.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11872152.1 / EP2764328 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5094523 (REZNICHENKO YAKOV [US], et al); | [Y]US5222477 (LIA RAYMOND A [US]); | [Y]US5751341 (CHALEKI CHRISTOPHER R [US], et al); | [Y]US5828487 (GREENING ANTHONY B [CA], et al); | [Y]WO2011003168 (ISEE3D INC [CA], et al) | by applicant | US6151164 |