EP2886823 - Heat exchanger comprising a bundle provided with means for limiting the movements of said exchange bundle relative to the walls of the housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systemes Thermiques Service Propriété Industrielle 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis / FR | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferlay, Benjamin 11 rue de Limours 78720 CERNAY LA VILLE / FR | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Metz, Gaëlle Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8, rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | Metz, Gaëlle Valeo Systèmes Thermiques S.A.S. Propriété Industrielle 8, rue Louis Lormand BP 517 - La Verrière 78321 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14195472.7 | 28.11.2014 | [2015/26] | Priority number, date | FR20130062905 | 18.12.2013 Original published format: FR 1362905 | [2015/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2886823 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02B29/04, F28D21/00 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
F02B29/0462 (EP,US);
F28D9/0062 (US);
F02B29/0475 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0082 (EP,US);
F28F2265/30 (EP,US);
F28F2265/32 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher, der ein Leitungsbündel umfasst, das mit Mitteln zur Begrenzung der Bewegungen dieses Austauschbündels in Bezug auf die Gehäusewände ausgestattet ist | [2015/26] | English: | Heat exchanger comprising a bundle provided with means for limiting the movements of said exchange bundle relative to the walls of the housing | [2015/26] | French: | Échangeur de chaleur comprenant un faisceau muni de moyens permettant de limiter les mouvements dudit faisceau d'échange par rapport aux parois du boîtier | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 22.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/44] | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1785609 (MODINE MFG CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract *; | [XI]EP2055921 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * [I] 3,4,7; | [XI]US2009277606 (REISS III THOMAS J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figure 3 * [I] 3,4,7; | [A]FR2989771 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [A] 1-7* abstract * |