EP2881908 - NFC top-up [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone IP Licensing Limited The Connection Newbury Berkshire RG14 2FN / GB | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ziebacz, Piotr c/o Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone Group Services Limited One Kingdom Street Paddington Central London W26BY / GB | 02 /
Daly, Keith c/o Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone Group Services Limited One Kingdom Street Paddington Central London W26BY / GB | 03 /
Egan, Marion c/o Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone Group Services Limited One Kingdom Street Paddington Central London W26BY / GB | 04 /
Harney, Pat c/o Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone Group Services Limited One Kingdom Street Paddington Central London W26BY / GB | 05 /
Reilly, Viv c/o Group Legal (Patents) Vodafone Group Services Limited One Kingdom Street Paddington Central London W26BY / GB | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14196136.7 | 03.12.2014 | [2015/24] | Priority number, date | GB20130021335 | 03.12.2013 Original published format: GB 201321335 | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881908 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/28, G06Q20/32 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
G06Q20/28 (EP,GB);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,GB);
G06Q20/1085 (GB);
G06Q20/327 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NFC-Nachfüllung | [2015/24] | English: | NFC top-up | [2015/24] | French: | Recharge NFC | [2015/24] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/23] | 19.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011202417 (DEWAKAR SUNNY RAMASWAMY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-11,13 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0015] , [0024] - [0044] - [0083] - [0120] * [I] 3-7,12 |