EP2881528 - Inner handle for a door or window [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricevuto, Jean-Luc Route du Lude 72200 La Flèche / FR | For all designated states Ricevuto, Baptiste La petite Sansonniere Route du Lude 72200 La Fleche / FR | For all designated states Ricevuto, Matthieu La petite Sansonnieres Route du Lude 72200 La Fleche / FR | For all designated states Franz Schneider Brakel GmbH & Co. KG Nieheimer Strasse 38 33034 Brakel / DE | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ricevuto, Jean-Luc Route du Lude 72200 La Flèche / FR | 02 /
Ricevuto, Baptiste La petite Sansonnière Route du Lude 72200 La Flèche / FR | 03 /
Ricevuto, Matthieu La petite Sansonnières Route du Lude 72200 La Flèche / FR | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Eidelsberg, Victor Albert, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [2015/24] | Application number, filing date | 14196498.1 | 05.12.2014 | [2015/24] | Priority number, date | FR20130002854 | 06.12.2013 Original published format: FR 1302854 | [2015/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881528 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E05B3/00 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
E05B3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Innengriff einer Tür oder eines Fensters | [2015/24] | English: | Inner handle for a door or window | [2015/24] | French: | Poignée intérieure de porte ou de fenêtre | [2015/24] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/26] | 01.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE224615 (WILHELM HOFFMANN) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2517240 (HOWARD ROBERTS) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-3,5,7 *; | [A]US1743955 (BRAUNING KARL A, et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 2,6,8 *; | [A]US1864878 (WOERNLE HARRY E) [A] 1-9 * figures 3-7 *; | [A]FR2663071 (LAURENT JEAN MICHEL, et al) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,6 *; | [A]FR1347103 (RINALDO GHIOSSO) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE10250960 (BREMICKER SOEHNE KG A [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1, 4 * |