EP2886772 - Device for fixing a window or a door in a wall opening and method for installation of a window or a door in a wall opening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nögel Montagetechnik Vertriebsgesellschaft mbH Koppelweg 1 49767 Twist / DE | [2015/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franke, Klaus-Peter Dillenweg 7 48455 Bad Bentheim / DE | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Binder, Armin Neue Bahnhofstrasse 16 89335 Ichenhausen / DE | [2015/26] | Application number, filing date | 14197167.1 | 10.12.2014 | [2015/26] | Priority number, date | DE20131021885 | 23.12.2013 Original published format: DE102013021885 | [2015/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2886772 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2886772 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E06B1/60 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
E06B1/60 (EP);
E06B1/6076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2015/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Fensters oder einer Tür in einer Wandöffnung und Verfahren zum Einbau eines Fensters oder einer Tür in eine Wandöffnung | [2015/26] | English: | Device for fixing a window or a door in a wall opening and method for installation of a window or a door in a wall opening | [2015/26] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d' une fenêtre ou d'une porte dans une ouverture de paroi et un procédé pour l'installation d' une fenêtre ou d'une porte dans une ouverture de paroi | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 22.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2014 | AL | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | TR | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | GB | 10.12.2020 | IE | 10.12.2020 | LU | 10.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 10.12.2014 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 10.12.2020 | ||
IE | 10.12.2020 | ||
LU | 10.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.12.2014 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 10.12.2020 | ||
IE | 10.12.2020 | ||
LU | 10.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 10.12.2020 | ||
IE | 10.12.2020 | ||
LU | 10.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 10.12.2020 | ||
IE | 10.12.2020 | ||
LU | 10.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
GB | 10.12.2020 | ||
IE | 10.12.2020 | ||
LU | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 10.12.2020 | ||
LU | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]AT340661B (HULINSKY JOSEF [AT]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-10,14-17 [I] 11-13; | [XDAI]DE202009013488U (KNELSEN GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,3,6 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * [A] 7-10,14-17 [I] 2,4; | [XAI]EP1849952 (SYLID SYSTEMLOGISTIK & INDUSTRIEDIENSTLEISTUNG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * figures 2-8, 28a-33 * [A] 7-10,14-17 [I] 2,5,11-13; | [A]DE20003819U (SFS IND HOLDING AG HEERBRUGG [CH]) [A] 11-13 * figure 1 * | Examination | WO2011115530 | by applicant | DE202009013488U | DE19715496 | DE20003819U |