EP2883504 - Coupling assembly for interconnecting an adapter assembly and a surgical device, and surgical systems thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richard, Paul 22 Woodsend Avenue Shelton, CT Connecticut 06484 / US | 02 /
Pierre, Joseph 5 Pheasant Road Bulbston Lake, NY New York 12019 / US | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Soames, Candida Jane Maschio & Soames IP Limited 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 14197563.1 | 12.12.2014 | [2015/25] | Priority number, date | US201361915667P | 13.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361915667 P | US201414515030 | 15.10.2014 Original published format: US201414515030 | [2015/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2883504 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2883504 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/068, // A61B17/072, A61B17/115, A61B17/29 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
A61B17/00234 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/07207 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/068 (CN,US);
A61B17/1155 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00017 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (CN,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2903 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/2923 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/25] | A61B17/00, // A61B17/072, A61B17/115, A61B17/29 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/14] |
Former [2015/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kupplungsanordnung zum Verbinden einer Adapteranordnung und einer chirurgischen Vorrichtung sowie chirurgische Systeme damit | [2015/25] | English: | Coupling assembly for interconnecting an adapter assembly and a surgical device, and surgical systems thereof | [2015/25] | French: | Ensemble de couplage permettant d'interconnecter un ensemble adaptateur et un dispositif chirurgical et systèmes chirurgicaux associés | [2015/25] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/14] | 31.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 12.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2009073577 (SURGIQUEST INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,10-14 * page 11, lines 17-24 * * page 21, line 13 - page 26, line 8 * * figures 8-12 *[A] 15; | [XA]WO2010030114 (JEONG CHANG WOOK [KR]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0072] - [0076] - [0082] , [0086] , [0111] , [0112]; figures 1,3,4,8,9,23 * [A] 6-15; | [XA]US2011071508 (DUVAL EUGENE F [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0222] - [0225]; figure 19B * [A] 6-15; | [XA]US2011276057 (CONLON SEAN P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0043] - [0050]; figures 1,5-9 * [A] 6-15; | [X]EP2586382 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0075] , [0110] - [0116] - [0121] - [0129]; figures 1,2,4,9-26 * | by applicant | US6264087 | US6315184 | US6348061 | US6443973 | US6488197 | US6491201 | US6533157 | US6716233 | US2009314821 |