EP2886700 - Fabric treatment apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2017/20] |
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahn, Hyukjin 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon.gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Song, Sungho 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon.gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Ye, Sangmin 51, Gasan digital 1-ro, Geumcheon.gu 153-802 Seoul / KR | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2015/26] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14197654.8 | 12.12.2014 | [2015/26] | Priority number, date | KR20130154957 | 12.12.2013 Original published format: KR 20130154957 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2886700 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2886700 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00, D06F58/20 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
D06F39/022 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F58/203 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F39/40 (EP,CN,KR,US);
D06F58/04 (KR);
D06F87/00 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Title | German: | Stoffbehandlungsvorrichtung | [2015/26] | English: | Fabric treatment apparatus | [2015/26] | French: | Appareil de traitement de tissu | [2015/26] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 22.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2014 | AL | 30.08.2017 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | CZ | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | ES | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | HR | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | MK | 30.08.2017 | NL | 30.08.2017 | PL | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | RS | 30.08.2017 | SE | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | SM | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | NO | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IE | 12.12.2017 | LU | 12.12.2017 | MT | 12.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | FR | 02.01.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 12.12.2014 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
MK | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.12.2017 | ||
MT | 12.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 12.12.2014 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
MK | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.12.2017 | ||
MT | 12.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 12.12.2014 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
MK | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.12.2017 | ||
MT | 12.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 12.12.2014 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.12.2017 | ||
MT | 12.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.12.2014 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.12.2017 | ||
MT | 12.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.12.2017 | ||
MT | 12.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.12.2017 | ||
MT | 12.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.12.2017 | ||
MT | 12.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IE | 12.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.12.2017 | ||
MT | 12.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
LU | 12.12.2017 | ||
MT | 12.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
PL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
NL | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
ES | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | |
NO | 30.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006101360 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0096] - [0100]; figure 8 *; | [A]EP1932963 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0055] - [0061]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP2141280 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031]; figure 2 *; | [AP]EP2703543 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [AP] 1-15* paragraphs [0066] - [0070]; figure 1 * |