EP2924429 - Gas phase component analyzer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frontier Laboratories Ltd. 8-14 Saikon 1-chome Koriyama-shi Fukushima 963-8862 / JP | [2015/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Chuichi c/o FRONTIER LABORATORIES LTD. 8-14, Saikon 1-chome Koriyama-shi, Fukushima 963-8862 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Atsushi c/o FRONTIER LABORATORIES LTD. 8-14, Saikon 1-chome Koriyama-shi, Fukushima 963-8862 / JP | 03 /
Ito, Koichi c/o FRONTIER LABORATORIES LTD. 8-14, Saikon 1-chome Koriyama-shi, Fukushima 963-8862 / JP | 04 /
Wang, Kaige c/o FRONTIER LABORATORIES LTD. 8-14, Saikon 1-chome Koriyama-shi, Fukushima 963-8862 / JP | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Schön, Christoph Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [2015/40] | Application number, filing date | 14198126.6 | 16.12.2014 | [2015/40] | Priority number, date | JP20140064809 | 26.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014064809 | JP20140123421 | 16.06.2014 Original published format: JP 2014123421 | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2924429 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/06 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
G01N30/06 (EP,US);
G01N30/32 (US);
G01N2030/008 (US);
G01N2030/025 (US);
G01N2030/067 (EP,US);
G01N2030/328 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gasphasenkomponentenanalysator | [2015/40] | English: | Gas phase component analyzer | [2015/40] | French: | Analyseur de composant en phase gazeuse | [2015/40] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 31.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 09.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5205845 (SACKS RICHARD D [US], et al) [Y] 7,8 * figure 2 * * column 5, line 1 - line 7 *; | [XD]JP2000028597 (FRONTIER LAB KK) [XD] 1-5* the whole document *; | [XY]JP2013255882 (FRONTIER LAB KK) [X] 1-6 * figures 1,8 * * paragraph [0083] * [Y] 7,8 | by applicant | JP2000028597 | JP2000171449 | - HENK L.C. MEUZELAAR ET AL., DEVELOPMENT OF ON-LINE GC/MS MONITORING TECHNIQUES FOR HIGH PRESSURE FUEL CONVERSION PROCESSES, CENTER FOR MICRO ANALYSIS AND REACTION CHEMISTRY, (20140310), pages 1147 - 1154 |