EP2891947 - Capacitive dongle for display devices comprising a capacitive touch-sensitive surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2022/18] |
Former [2015/28] | For all designated states Thales 45, rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly Sur Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sontag, Yves 25 rue Fragonard Résidence Marly 33200 Bordeaux / FR | 02 /
Coni, Philippe 315 rue du Courtiou 33127 Saint Jean D'Illac / FR | 03 /
Abadie, Jean-Christophe 86 rue Georges Clémenceau 33380 Biganos / FR | [2015/28] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Marks & Clerk France Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2015/28] | Bréda, Jean-Marc, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14198224.9 | 16.12.2014 | [2015/28] | Priority number, date | FR20130003028 | 20.12.2013 Original published format: FR 1303028 | [2015/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2891947 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2891947 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/00, G06F3/044, H04B5/00, G06F3/039 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/002 (EP,US);
G06F3/0393 (EP,US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F3/0441 (EP,US);
G06F3/0442 (EP,US);
G06F3/0446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] |
Former [2015/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kapazitiver Dongle für Anzeigevorrichtungen, die eine kapazitive berührungsempfindliche Oberfläche haben | [2015/28] | English: | Capacitive dongle for display devices comprising a capacitive touch-sensitive surface | [2015/28] | French: | Dongle capacitif pour dispositifs de visualisation comportant une surface tactile capacitive | [2015/28] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 08.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2014 | AL | 04.05.2022 | AT | 04.05.2022 | CY | 04.05.2022 | CZ | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | ES | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | IT | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | NL | 04.05.2022 | PL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SE | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | GB | 16.12.2022 | IE | 16.12.2022 | LU | 16.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | [2024/21] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.12.2014 | |
AL | 04.05.2022 | ||
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
GB | 16.12.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
IT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
GB | 16.12.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
GB | 16.12.2022 | ||
IE | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
GB | 16.12.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
LU | 16.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008238879 (JAEGER DENNY [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0087] *; | [I]US2010315384 (HARGREAVES KIRK [US], et al) [I] 1,2 * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] , [0021] , [0027] , [0034] , [0052] , [0055] , [0057] , [0060] *; | [XAYI]US2013225072 (FULLER THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10 * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] - [0028] , [0030] , [0033] - [0038] - [0042] - [0050]; figures 3,6 * [A] 2 [Y] 4 [I] 3,6-9; | [A]WO2013172829 (BLACKBERRY LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |