EP2851806 - Enabling routing of data on a network based on a portion of data accessed from a non-network enabled device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/35] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jain, Manoj K. c/o Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
Grandhi, Srinivasulu c/o Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
Sarkar, Ananda c/o Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2015/13] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14198422.9 | 12.03.2008 | [2015/13] | Priority number, date | US20070724383 | 15.03.2007 Original published format: US 724383 | [2015/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2851806 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2851806 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, H04L29/08, H04L29/06, H04L12/715 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
H04N1/00241 (EP,US);
H04L67/59 (EP,US);
H04L67/56 (EP,US);
H04L67/63 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (EP,US);
H04L45/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/46] |
Former [2015/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ermöglichung zum Routing von Daten in einem Netzwerk auf Basis eines Datenabschnitts, auf den von einer nicht-netzwerkaktivierten Vorrichtung zugegriffen wird | [2015/13] | English: | Enabling routing of data on a network based on a portion of data accessed from a non-network enabled device | [2015/13] | French: | Activation de routage de données dans un réseau basé sur une partie des données à laquelle l'accès se fait par un équipement non compatible réseau | [2015/13] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 02.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08731940.6 / EP2122479 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2008 | AT | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | IE | 12.03.2017 | LU | 12.03.2017 | MT | 12.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/47] | HU | 12.03.2008 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
MT | 12.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.03.2008 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
MT | 12.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
MT | 12.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 12.03.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 12.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5461488 (WITEK KEITH E [US]) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 10 - line 30 * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 41; figure 1 * * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 56 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 30 *; | [A]EP1089539 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005]; figures 1-4B * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0074] *; | [A]US2005134904 (VOSKUIL ERIC K [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006117369 (LEE KI-MOON [KR]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-4 * |