EP2889781 - Graph display control device, electronic device, graph display method and storage medium recording graph display control processing program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Casio Computer Co., Ltd. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Endo, Kota c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center, 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Kentaro c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center, 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 03 /
Karoji, Kosuke c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R&D Center, 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | [2015/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/27] | Application number, filing date | 14198487.2 | 17.12.2014 | [2015/27] | Priority number, date | JP20130271793 | 27.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013271793 | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2889781 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2889781 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2889781 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/02 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
G06F15/0225 (EP,US);
G06T11/206 (US);
G06T11/001 (US);
G06T11/203 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Title | German: | Graphanzeigesteuerungsvorrichtung, elektronische Vorrichtung, Graphanzeigeverfahren und Speichermedium zur Aufzeichnung von Graphanzeigesteuerungsverarbeitungsprogramm | [2015/27] | English: | Graph display control device, electronic device, graph display method and storage medium recording graph display control processing program | [2015/27] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'affichage de graphique, dispositif électronique, procédé d'affichage de graphes et support de stockage enregistrant un programme de traitement de commande d'affichage graphique | [2015/27] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 20.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.12.2022 | AT | 28.12.2022 | CZ | 28.12.2022 | DK | 28.12.2022 | EE | 28.12.2022 | ES | 28.12.2022 | FI | 28.12.2022 | HR | 28.12.2022 | IT | 28.12.2022 | LT | 28.12.2022 | LV | 28.12.2022 | MC | 28.12.2022 | NL | 28.12.2022 | PL | 28.12.2022 | RO | 28.12.2022 | RS | 28.12.2022 | SE | 28.12.2022 | SI | 28.12.2022 | SK | 28.12.2022 | SM | 28.12.2022 | NO | 28.03.2023 | GR | 29.03.2023 | IS | 28.04.2023 | PT | 28.04.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
IT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 28.12.2022 | |
AT | 28.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 28.12.2022 | |
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
NL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/27] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RS | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 28.12.2022 | |
NO | 28.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2011181050 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [AD] 4,5,7 * figures 10a, 12a, 12c, and 13c *; | [XI] - Casio, "ClassPad II fx-CP400 User's Guide - Chapter 3: Graph & Table Application", (20130228), URL: https://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/www.mrcdn.com/pdf/casio/casio-classpad-ii-fx-cp400-owners-manual-590285.pdf, (20171220), XP055436833 [X] 1-3,9-11 * section Graphing a Stored Function; page 98 * * section 3-7: Modifying a Graph; page 113 * [I] 4-8 | [A] - Texas Instruments, "TI-84 Plus and TI-84 Plus Silver Edition Guidebook - Chapter 3: Function Graphing", (20101207), URL: https://education.ti.com/-/media/6CC4C5AED5004F808892046AD33D4A35, (20171220), XP055436809 [A] 8 * chapter 3: Function Graphing; page 65 * | [A] - Casio, "fx-9750G PLUS/CFX-9850G PLUS/CFX-9850GB PLUS/CFX-9850GC PLUS/CFX-9950GB PLUS Manual - Chapter 13: Dynamic Graph", (20041102), URL: http://support.casio.com/pdf/004/fx_plus_chapter13.pdf, (20171220), XP055436980 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH09282475 | JP2011181050 |