EP2927679 - Device for measuring and analysing the multiple breath nitrogen washout method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ndd Medizintechnik AG Technoparkstrasse 1 8005 Zürich / CH | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buess, Christian, Dr. Kelliweg 28 8810 Horgen / CH | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2021/39] |
Former [2015/41] | Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 14198579.6 | 17.12.2014 | [2015/41] | Priority number, date | DE20141004765 | 01.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014004765 | [2015/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2927679 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2927679 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/024, A61B5/087, A61B5/091, G01N29/22 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
G01N33/497 (EP,CN,US);
A61M16/085 (CN,US);
A61B5/0813 (CN,US);
A61B5/082 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/083 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/0836 (CN,US);
A61B5/087 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/091 (EP,CN,US);
A61B5/097 (CN,US);
A61B5/486 (CN,US);
A61B5/7225 (CN,US);
A61B5/742 (CN,US);
A61M16/0833 (CN,US);
G01N21/64 (CN);
G01N29/02 (EP,CN,US);
G01N29/024 (EP,CN,US);
G01N29/222 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2560/0223 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2560/0475 (CN,US);
A61B2562/0204 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2202/0208 (CN,US);
A61M2202/0225 (CN,US);
A61M2202/0266 (CN,US);
G01N2291/0215 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Title | German: | Gerät für die Messung und Analyse des Multiple-Breath-Stickstoff-Auswaschverfahrens | [2021/20] | English: | Device for measuring and analysing the multiple breath nitrogen washout method | [2015/41] | French: | Dispositif de mesure et d'analyse du procédé du lavage Multiple Breath à l'azote | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/41] | Gerät für die messung und analyse des multiple-breath-stickstoff-auswaschverfahrens | Examination procedure | 03.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 08.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.12.2014 | AL | 29.09.2021 | CY | 29.09.2021 | CZ | 29.09.2021 | DK | 29.09.2021 | EE | 29.09.2021 | ES | 29.09.2021 | FI | 29.09.2021 | HR | 29.09.2021 | IT | 29.09.2021 | LT | 29.09.2021 | LV | 29.09.2021 | MC | 29.09.2021 | MK | 29.09.2021 | MT | 29.09.2021 | NL | 29.09.2021 | PL | 29.09.2021 | RO | 29.09.2021 | RS | 29.09.2021 | SE | 29.09.2021 | SI | 29.09.2021 | SK | 29.09.2021 | SM | 29.09.2021 | TR | 29.09.2021 | AT | 17.12.2021 | IE | 17.12.2021 | LU | 17.12.2021 | BG | 29.12.2021 | GB | 29.12.2021 | NO | 29.12.2021 | GR | 30.12.2021 | BE | 31.12.2021 | FR | 31.12.2021 | IS | 29.01.2022 | PT | 31.01.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
MK | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
TR | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 17.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GB | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
MK | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 17.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GB | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 17.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GB | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 17.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GB | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 17.12.2014 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 17.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GB | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 17.12.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GB | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GB | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GB | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
BE | 31.12.2021 | ||
FR | 31.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
IE | 17.12.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GB | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
GB | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
LU | 17.12.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 29.09.2021 | |
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 29.09.2021 | |
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
NO | 29.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - FLORIAN SINGER ET AL, "A Realistic Validation Study of a New Nitrogen Multiple-Breath Washout System", PLOS ONE, (20120427), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0036083, page e36083, XP055203322 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0036083 | [Y] - FLORIAN SINGER ET AL, "Tidal Volume Single Breath Washout of Two Tracer Gases - A Practical and Promising Lung Function Test", PLOS ONE, (20110310), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0017588, page e17588, XP055207522 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, column l, paragraph l - page 4, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0017588 | by applicant | EP0597060 | EP0653919 | EP1764035 | EP1764036 | - A.A. HUTCHISON; A.C. SUM; T.A. DEMIS; A. ERBEN; L.. LANDAU, "Momentanalyse eines Multiple-Breath Stickstoff Auswaschverfahrens bei Kindern", AM REV RESPIR DIS, (1982), vol. 125, pages 28 - 32 | - "Übereinkommenserklärung für Inertgas-Auswaschverfahrenmessungen bei Gebrauch von Multiple- und Single Breath Tests", EUR RESPIR J, (2013), vol. 41, pages 507 - 522 | - "berein-kommenserklärung für Inertgas-Auswaschverfahrenmessungen bei Gebrauch von Multiple- und Single Breath Tests", EUR RESPIR J, (2013), vol. 41, pages 507 - 522 | - P.M. GUSTAFSSON; P. AURORA; A. LINDBLAD, "Auswertung von fehlverteilter Beatmung als ein frühes Anzeichen für Lungenkrankheiten bei unter cystischen Fibrosen leidenden Kindern", EUR RESPIR J, (2003), vol. 22, pages 972 - 979 | - F. SINGER; B. HOULTZ; P. LATZIN; P. ROBINSON; P. GUSTAFSSON, "Eine realistische Validierungsstudie eines neuen Multiple-Breath-Stickstoff Auswaschverfahrens", PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 4, page E36083 | - "Übereinkommenserklärung für Inertgas-Auswaschverfahrenmessungen bei Gebrauch von Multiple- und Single-Breath-Tests", EUR RESPIR J, (2013), vol. 41, pages 507 - 522 | - R. LAUBER; B. SEEBERGER; A.M. ZBINDEN, "Kohlenstoffdioxid-Analsysatoren: Genauigkeit, Alarmgrenzwerte und Auswirkungen eingreifender Gase", CAN J ANAESTH, (1995), vol. 42, no. 7, pages 643 - 656 |