EP3035486 - Method and device for charging, in particular for sequential charging of rechargeable batteries and charging of severely drained batteries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fritec Friedrich & Hitschfel GmbH Mittelrüsselbach 38 91338 Igensdorf / DE | [2016/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friedrich, Uwe Mittelrüsselbach 38 91338 Igensdorf / DE | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2016/25] | Application number, filing date | 14199364.2 | 19.12.2014 | [2016/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3035486 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2016/25] | CPC: |
H02J7/0019 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Laden, insbesondere zum sequentiellen Laden, von wiederaufladbaren Batterien und zum Laden von tiefentladenden Batterien | [2016/25] | English: | Method and device for charging, in particular for sequential charging of rechargeable batteries and charging of severely drained batteries | [2016/25] | French: | Procédé et dispositif destinés à la charge, notamment à la charge séquentielle de batteries rechargeables et à la charge de batteries à décharge profonde | [2016/25] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 20.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 23.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2004049540 (TIAX LLC [US], et al) [X] 6,9,10 * page 25 - page 29; figures 7-12 * [Y] 1-5,7,8,11-15; | [Y]EP0938180 (HAGEN BATTERIE AG [DE]) [Y] 1-5,7,8,11-15 * paragraphs [0043] - [0074]; figures 1-4 * |