EP2921956 - Information processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondoh, Sayako c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/39] | Application number, filing date | 14199634.8 | 22.12.2014 | [2015/39] | Priority number, date | JP20140053665 | 17.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014053665 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2921956 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F11/26 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
G06F9/5011 (EP,US);
H04L47/822 (US);
G06F11/2094 (EP,US);
G06F11/3409 (US);
H04L47/83 (EP);
G06F11/2097 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungssystem | [2015/39] | English: | Information processing system | [2015/39] | French: | Système de traitement d'informations | [2015/39] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 21.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.10.2018 | 20.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/45] | 30.06.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 29.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - KEETON K ET AL, "On the road to recovery: restoring data after disasters", OPERATING SYSTEMS REVIEW ACM USA, (200610), vol. 40, no. 4, ISSN 0163-5980, pages 235 - 248, XP002739735 [I] 1-9 * page 235 - page 239 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1217935.1217958 | [I] - TAPAN NAYAK ET AL, "End-to-end disaster recovery planning: From art to science", NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM (NOMS), 2010 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100419), ISBN 978-1-4244-5366-5, pages 357 - 364, XP031692008 [I] 1-9 * page 361 - page 363 * | [A] - MARKUS KLEMS ET AL, "Automating the delivery of IT Service Continuity Management through cloud service orchestration", NETWORK OPERATIONS AND MANAGEMENT SYMPOSIUM (NOMS), 2010 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100419), ISBN 978-1-4244-5366-5, pages 65 - 72, XP031691955 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - TIMOTHY WOOD ET AL, "Disaster Recovery as a Cloud Service: Economic Benefits & Deployment Challenges", USENIX,, (20100527), pages 1 - 7, XP061009970 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - ROTARU O P, "Architecting for Disaster Recovery - A Practitioner View", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2011 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SECURITY & MANAGEMENT (SAM 2011) CSREA PRESS LAS VEGAS, NV, USA, (2011), vol. 2, ISBN 1-60132-196-1, pages 442 - 448, XP002739736 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2000347997 | JP2006244450 | JP2010198060 |