EP3040348 - Graft copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galderma S.A. Zugerstrasse 8 6330 Cham / CH | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergman, Kristoffer Malmgårdsvägen 32A 11638 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
Olsson, Johan Ulvsunda Slottsväg 15 16733 Bromma / SE | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 14200376.3 | 29.12.2014 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3040348 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/02, C08B37/00, C08B37/08, C08G81/00 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
C08B37/0072 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/91 (EP,US);
A61L27/20 (US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
C08B37/0021 (EP,US);
C08B37/0069 (EP,US);
C08G81/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/91 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Pfropfcopolymer | [2016/27] | English: | Graft copolymer | [2016/27] | French: | Copolymère greffé | [2016/27] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011059325 (UNIV TWENTE INST FOR BIOMEDICAL TECHNOLOGY AND TECHNICAL MEDICINE MIRA [NL], et al); | by applicant | WO9704012 |