EP3040375 - HDPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abu Dhabi Polymers Co. Ltd (Borouge) LLC. Sheikh Khalifa Energy Complex P.O. Box 6925 Corniche Road Abu Dhabi / AE | For all designated states Borealis AG Trabrennstrasse 6-8 1020 Vienna / AT | [2022/10] |
Former [2016/27] | For all designated states Abu Dhabi Polymers Co. Ltd (Borouge) LLC. Sheikh Khalifa Energy Complex P.O. Box 6925 Corniche Road Abu Dhabi / AE | ||
For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buryak, Andrey Borouge Pte LTd 11th Floor Borouge Tower Sheikh Khalifa Energy Complex, P.O. Box 6951 Abu Dhabi / AE | 02 /
Kumar, Ashish Borouge Pte Ltd 11th Floor Borouge Tower Sheikh Khalifa Energy Complex, P.O. Box 6951 Abu Dhabi / AE | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/06] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2016/27] | Campbell, Neil Boyd Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14200666.7 | 30.12.2014 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3040375 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3040375 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/04, C08L23/06, C08F2/00, C08L23/08 | [2018/34] | CPC: |
C08L23/06 (EP,CN,US);
C08F2/001 (EP,US);
C08L23/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (US);
C08L2205/02 (CN);
C08L2207/062 (EP,CN,US);
C08L2314/02 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F2/001 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/6555 (EP,US);
C08L23/04, C08L23/0815 (US,EP);
C08L23/06, C08L23/0815 (CN,EP,US); |
Former IPC [2016/27] | C08L23/04, C08L23/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2016/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HDPE | [2016/27] | English: | HDPE | [2016/27] | French: | HDPE | [2016/27] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2014 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2019
08.11.2019
ADMISSIBLE Ineos Europe AG Avenue des Uttins 3 1180 Rolle, Vaud / CH Opponent's representative Smith, Julian Philip Howard Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [2022/33] |
Former [2019/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2019
ADMISSIBLE Ineos Europe AG Avenue des Uttins 3 1180 Rolle, Vaud / CH Opponent's representative Smith, Julian Philip Howard Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4PR / GB | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 19.11.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.04.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.03.2021 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 07.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 04.05.2021 | Appeal received No. T0504/21 | 04.05.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 05.07.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.08.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure | 30.11.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2014 | AL | 06.02.2019 | AT | 06.02.2019 | CY | 06.02.2019 | CZ | 06.02.2019 | DK | 06.02.2019 | EE | 06.02.2019 | FI | 06.02.2019 | HR | 06.02.2019 | LT | 06.02.2019 | LV | 06.02.2019 | MC | 06.02.2019 | MK | 06.02.2019 | MT | 06.02.2019 | NL | 06.02.2019 | PL | 06.02.2019 | RO | 06.02.2019 | RS | 06.02.2019 | SE | 06.02.2019 | SI | 06.02.2019 | SK | 06.02.2019 | SM | 06.02.2019 | TR | 06.02.2019 | BG | 06.05.2019 | NO | 06.05.2019 | GR | 07.05.2019 | IS | 06.06.2019 | PT | 06.06.2019 | IE | 30.12.2019 | LU | 30.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.12.2014 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.12.2014 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 30.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 06.02.2019 | |
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0071615 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-16 * claims 1-7 * * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 20 * * page 6, line 12 - page 8, line 26 * * page 12; examples 1-5; table 2 *; | [X]EP1655336 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [X] 1-16 * claims 1,4,8,10-24 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0005] , [0007] , [0101] - [0113] * * examples 1-5; tables 1,2 *; | [I]EP1655339 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [I] 1-16 * claims 1,12,16,32 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0074] , [0075] * * examples 1,2,6; tables 1,2 *; | [A]EP2130860 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [A] 1-16 * claims 1,2,10 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0099] - [0116] * * examples 1,2; table 1 *; | [AD]WO2013045663 (TOTAL RES & TECHNOLOGY FELUY [BE]) [AD] 1-16* the whole document * | by applicant | EP0517868 | EP0688794 | WO9618662 | WO9744371 | EP0810235 | WO03039984 | WO2004055068 | WO2004055069 | EP1565525 | WO2010022941 | JP4942525B | WO2013045663 | WO2014180989 | - KLIMKE, K.; PARKINSON, M.; PIEL, C.; KAMINSKY, W.; SPIESS, H.W.; WILHELM, M., MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (2006), vol. 207, page 382 | - POLLARD, M.; KLIMKE, K.; GRAF, R.; SPIESS, H.W.; WILHELM, M.; SPERBER, 0.; PIEL, C.; KAMINSKY, W., MACROMOLECULES, (2004), vol. 37, page 813 | - FILIP, X.; TRIPON, C.; FILIP, C., J. MAG. RESN., (2005), vol. 176, page 239 | - GRIFFIN, J.M.; TRIPON, C.; SAMOSON, A.; FILIP, C.; BROWN, S.P., MAG. RES. IN CHEM., (2007), vol. 45, page S1,S198 | - J. RANDALL, MACROMOL. SCI., REV. MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (1989), vol. C29, page 201 | - HEINO, E.L.; LEHTINEN, A.; TANNER J.; SEPPALA, J., "Rheological characterization of polyethylene fractions", NESTE OY, PORVOO, FINLAND, THEOR. APPL. RHEOL., PROC. INT. CONGR. RHEOL, 11TH, (1992), vol. 1, pages 360 - 362, XP008137571 | - "Definition of terms relating to the non-ultimate mechanical properties of polymers", PURE & APPL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 70, no. 3, pages 701 - 754 | Opposition | WO0071615 | US6462135 | EP1441959 | EP1655336 | - Hagstrom B., "Prediction of Melt Flow Rate of bimodal polyethylene's based on MFR of their components", Conference of Polymer Processing, (19970819), page 4:13, XP055273670 |