EP2907748 - Aircraft or aircraft section comprising a bay, and method of operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAE Systems PLC 6 Carlton Gardens London SW1Y 5AD / GB | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Warwick House P.O. Box 87 Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14275026.4 | 17.02.2014 | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2907748 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B64C39/02, B64D1/04, B64D1/06 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
B64D1/04 (EP);
B64D1/06 (EP);
B64U2101/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flugzeug oder Flugzeugteil mit einem Schacht und Betriebsverfahren dafür | [2015/34] | English: | Aircraft or aircraft section comprising a bay, and method of operating the same | [2015/34] | French: | Aéronef ou tronçon d'aéronef comprenant une baie et son procédé de fonctionnement | [2015/34] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2016/03] | 11.09.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB479858 (VICKERS AVIAT LTD, et al); | [XAY]US2975676 (BUTLER GEORGE V); | [A]US3511457 (POGUE JOSEPH M); | [YA]DE102010010508 (DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |