EP2903378 - COMMUNICATION RESOURCE ALLOCATION IN WIRELESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/32] | Communication resource allocation in wireless networks | ||
[2018/27] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lim, Seau Sian Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd The Quadrant Stonehill Green Westlea Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 7DJ / GB | 02 /
Palat, Sudeep Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd The Quadrant Stonehill Green Westlea Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 7DJ / GB | 03 /
Wong, Shin Horng Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd The Quadrant Stonehill Green Westlea Swindon, Wiltshire SN5 7DJ / GB | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Mills, Julia, et al Script IP Limited 18 Bridge Street Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | [2015/32] | Application number, filing date | 14305119.1 | 30.01.2014 | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903378 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W74/00, H04W72/04 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04W72/51 (EP,US);
H04W74/006 (EP,US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/32] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2015/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSRESSOURCENZUWEISUNG IN DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERKEN | [2018/27] | English: | COMMUNICATION RESOURCE ALLOCATION IN WIRELESS NETWORKS | [2018/27] | French: | AFFECTATION DE RESSOURCES DE COMMUNICATION DANS DES RÉSEAUX SANS FIL | [2018/27] |
Former [2015/32] | Kommunikationsressourcenzuweisung in drahtlosen Netzwerken | ||
Former [2015/32] | Communication resource allocation in wireless networks | ||
Former [2015/32] | Affectation de ressources de communication dans des réseaux sans fil | Examination procedure | 21.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 16.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 19.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2012150883 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 1,5-7,11-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 14 - line 23 ** page 4, line 15 - line 22 *; | [YA]EP2680656 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,5-7,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] * [A] 2-4,8-10 |