EP2959913 - Use of a neurofilament peptide for targeting neural stem cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITE D'ANGERS 40, rue de Rennes 49000 Angers / FR | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states UNIVERSITE D'ANGERS 40, rue de Rennes 49000 Angers / FR | ||
For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eyer, Joël La Croix-Piron 49320 BLAISON-GOHIER / FR | 02 /
Lepinoux - Chambaud, Claire 1 rue Bournadour 16500 CONFOLENS / FR | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14305981.4 | 23.06.2014 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959913 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, C07K14/47, G01N33/574 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
A61K38/17 (EP,US);
A61K38/16 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/64 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N33/56966 (US);
G01N33/57407 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung von Neurofilamentpeptid zum Targeting von neuralen Stammzellen | [2016/01] | English: | Use of a neurofilament peptide for targeting neural stem cells | [2016/01] | French: | Utilisation d'un peptide de neurofilament pour cibler les cellules souches neurales | [2016/01] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/52] | 09.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006270834 (KANNO HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009136007 (LAAKKONEN PIRJO [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * examples 1-6 * * claims 1-11 *; | [A]WO2011073207 (UNIV ANGERS [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - LAINE A.-L. ET AL., "Brain tumour targeting strategies via coated ferrociphenol lipid nanocapsules", EUR. J. PHARM. BIOPHARM., (20120426), vol. 81, no. 3, pages 690 - 693, XP028405178 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpb.2012.04.012 | [AD] - BALZEAU J. ET AL., "The effect of functionalizing lipid nanocapsules with NFL-TBS.40-63 peptide on their uptake by glioblastoma cells", BIOMATERIALS, (20130204), vol. 34, no. 13, pages 3381 - 3389, XP055141672 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2013.01.068 | [AD] - LÉPINOUX-CHAMBAUD C. ET AL., "The NFL-TBS.40-63 anti-glioblastoma peptide enters selectively in glioma cells by endocytosis", INT. J. PHARMACEUTICS, (20130417), vol. 454, no. 2, pages 738 - 747, XP055141667 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2013.04.004 | by applicant | - AGASSE ET AL., "Neurogenic and intact or apoptotic non-neurogenic areas of adult brain release diffusible molecules that differentially modulate the development of subventricular zone cell cultures", EUR J NEUROSCI., (200403), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 1459 - 68 | - AHMED ET AL., "Transcription factors and neural stem cell self-renewal, growth and differentiation", CELL ADH MIGR., (2009), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 412 - 24 | - BALZEAU J; PINIER M; BERGES R; SAULNIER P; BENOIT JP; EYER J, "The effect of functionalizing lipid nanocapsules with NFL-TBS.40-63 peptide on their uptake by glioblastoma cells", BIOMATERIALS, (2013), vol. 34, no. 13, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biomaterials.2013.01.068, pages 3381 - 3389, XP028984666 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2013.01.068 | - BECKERVORDERSANDFORTH R; TRIPATHI P; NINKOVIC J; BAYAM E; LEPIER A; STEMPFHUBER B; KIRCHHOFF F; HIRRLINGER J; HASLINGER A; LIE DC, "In vivo fate mapping and expression analysis reveals molecular hallmarks of prospectively isolated adult neural stem cells", CELL STEM CELL, (2010), vol. 7, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.stem.2010.11.017, pages 744 - 758, XP028211790 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2010.11.017 | - BERGES R; BALZEAU J; PETERSON AC; EYER J, "A tubulin binding peptide targets glioma cells disrupting their microtubules, blocking migration, and inducing apoptosis", MOL THER, (2012), vol. 20, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1038/mt.2012.45, pages 1367 - 1377, XP008156433 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2012.45 | - BEXELL D; SVENSSON A; BENGZON J, "Stem cell-based therapy for malignant glioma", CANCER TREAT REV, (2013), vol. 39, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ctrv.2012.06.006, pages 358 - 365, XP029004169 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ctrv.2012.06.006 | - BOCQUET A; BERGES R; FRANK R; ROBERT P; PETERSON AC; EYER J, "Neurofilaments bind tubulin and modulate its polymerization", J NEUROSCI, (2009), vol. 29, no. 35, pages 11043 - 11054, XP002581714 | - COSKUN V; WU H; BLANCHI B; TSAO S; KIM K; ZHAO J; BIANCOTTI JC; HUTNICK L; KRUEGER RC, JR.; FAN G, "CD133+ neural stem cells in the ependyma of mammalian postnatal forebrain", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2008), vol. 105, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0710000105, pages 1026 - 1031, XP055276793 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0710000105 | - GAGE FH, "Mammalian neural stem cells", SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 287, no. 5457, doi:doi:10.1126/science.287.5457.1433, pages 1433 - 1438, XP002292502 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.287.5457.1433 | - HALL PA; WATT FM, "Stem cells: the generation and maintenance of cellular diversity", DEVELOPMENT, (1989), vol. 106, no. 4, pages 619 - 633 | - JO J; SONG H; PARK SG; LEE SH; KO JJ; PARK JH; JEONG J; CHEON YP; LEE DR, "Regulation of differentiation potential of human mesenchymal stem cells by intracytoplasmic delivery of coactivator-associated arginine methyltransferase 1 protein using cell-penetrating peptide", STEM CELLS, (2012), vol. 30, no. 8, pages 1703 - 1713 | - JOHNSON CP; FUJIMOTO I; RUTISHAUSER U; LECKBAND DE, "Direct evidence that neural cell adhesion molecule (NCAM) polysialylation increases intermembrane repulsion and abrogates adhesion", J BIOL CHEM, (2005), vol. 280, no. 1, pages 137 - 145, XP002504132 | - KATSETOS CD; DRABEROVA E; LEGIDO A; DUMONTET C; DRABER P, "Tubulin targets in the pathobiology and therapy of glioblastoma multiforme. I. Class III beta-tubulin", J CELL PHYSIO/, (2009), vol. 221, no. 3, pages 505 - 513 | - KIM SU; LEE HJ; KIM YB, "Neural stem cell-based treatment for neurodegenerative diseases", NEUROPATHOLOGY, (2013), vol. 33, no. 5, pages 491 - 504 | - LEI Y; TANG H; YAO L; YU R; FENG M; ZOU B, "Applications of mesenchymal stem cells labeled with Tat peptide conjugated quantum dots to cell tracking in mouse body", BIOCONJUG CHEM, (2008), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 421 - 427 | - LENDAHL U; ZIMMERMAN LB; MCKAY RD, "CNS stem cells express a new class of intermediate filament protein", CELL, (1990), vol. 60, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(90)90662-X, pages 585 - 595, XP025423417 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(90)90662-X | - LEPINOUX-CHAMBAUD C; EYER J, "The NFL-TBS.40-63 anti-glioblastoma peptide enters selectively in glioma cells by endocytosis", INTJ PHARM, (2013), vol. 454, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ijpharm.2013.04.004, pages 738 - 747, XP055141667 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2013.04.004 | - NAKAMURA Y; YAMAMOTO M; ODA E; YAMAMOTO A; KANEMURA Y; HARA M; SUZUKI A; YAMASAKI M; OKANO H, "Expression of tubulin beta II in neural stem/progenitor cells and radial fibers during human fetal brain development", LAB INVEST, (2003), vol. 83, no. 4, pages 479 - 489 | - OH M.C.; LIM D. A., "Novel treatment strategies for malignant gliomas using neural stem cells", NEUROTHERAPEUTICS, (2009), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.nurt.2009.05.003, pages 458 - 64, XP026254703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nurt.2009.05.003 | - REIGNER B; BLESCH K., "Estimating the starting dose for entry into humans: principles and practice", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2002), vol. 57, no. 12, pages 835 - 845 | - REYNOLDS BA; WEISS S, "Generation of neurons and astrocytes from isolated cells of the adult mammalian central nervous system", SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 255, no. 5052, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1553558, pages 1707 - 1710, XP000561246 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1553558 | - SHAH BS; CLARK PA; MOIOLI EK; STROSCIO MA; MAO JJ, "Labeling of mesenchymal stem cells by bioconjugated quantum dots", NANO LETT, (2007), vol. 7, no. 10, pages 3071 - 3079 | - STEWART KM; HORTON KL; KELLEY SO, "Cell-penetrating peptides as delivery vehicles for biology and medicine", ORG BIOMOL CHEM, (2008), vol. 6, no. 13, pages 2242 - 2255 | - SUH H; CONSIGLIO A; RAY J; SAWAI T; D'AMOUR KA; GAGE FH, "In vivo fate analysis reveals the multipotent and self-renewal capacities of Sox2+ neural stem cells in the adult hippocampus", CELL STEM CELL, (2007), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 515 - 528 | - TAUPIN P., "Neurogenic drugs and compounds to treat CNS diseases and disorders", CENT NERV SYSTAGENTS MED CHEM., (2011), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 35 - 7 | - WEIGMANN A; CORBEIL D; HELLWIG A; HUTTNER WB, "Prominin, a novel microvilli-specific polytopic membrane protein of the apical surface of epithelial cells, is targeted to plasmalemmal protrusions of non-epithelial cells", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1997), vol. 94, no. 23, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.94.23.12425, pages 12425 - 12430, XP002143047 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.23.12425 | - YUKAWA H; NOGUCHI H; NAKASE I; MIYAMOTO Y; OISHI K; HAMAJIMA N; FUTAKI S; HAYASHI S, "Transduction of cell-penetrating peptides into induced pluripotent stem cells", CELL TRANSPLANT, (2010), vol. 19, no. 6, pages 901 - 909 |