EP2991024 - Method for measuring the use of a vehicle by a user and corresponding system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rhelimi, Alain c/o GEMALTO SA Intellectual Property Department Avenue du Pic de Bertagne - Parc d'Activités de Gémenos -, CS 12023 13881 GEMENOS / FR | [2016/09] | Application number, filing date | 14306309.7 | 25.08.2014 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991024 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/04, G07B15/02, G06Q50/30, // G06Q20/04 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
G06Q30/04 (EP);
G06Q20/0457 (EP);
G06Q50/40 (EP);
G07B15/02 (EP);
G07F17/0057 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Messung der Benutzung eines Kraftfahrzeugs durch einen Benutzer und entsprechendes System | [2016/09] | English: | Method for measuring the use of a vehicle by a user and corresponding system | [2016/09] | French: | Procédé pour mesurer l'utilisation d'un véhicule par un utilisateur et système correspondant | [2016/09] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 13.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02073546 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 2, lines 3-21 * * page 4, lines 11-24 * * page 6, lines 14-25 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 11 *; | [X]US2004015475 (SCHEEPSMA LEONARD [NL]) [X] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 16 - page 2, paragraph 21 * * page 2, paragraph 28 * * page 3, paragraphs 32-37,42 * * page 3, paragraph 46 - page 4, paragraph 50 * * page 4, paragraph 55 - paragraph 59 * * page 4, paragraph 64 - page 5, paragraph 66 * * page 5, paragraph 80 - paragraph 83 * * page 6, paragraph 91 * * pages 6-7, paragraphs 97-98,103 *; | [X]US2012254040 (DIXON PHILIP B [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * pages 1-2, paragraphs 5,6,7,10 * * pages 2-3, paragraphs 11,12,15,16,18 * * pages 3-4, paragraph 41 * * pages 5-6, paragraph 59 * * page 6, paragraph 62 - page 7, paragraph 67 * * pages 7-8, paragraphs 78,81,83,84 * * pages 8-9, paragraphs 87,93 * * page 11, paragraphs 105,107,110 * * page 12, paragraphs 116,122 * * figure 3A *; | [A] - DAVIDE FIGO ET AL, "Preprocessing techniques for context recognition from accelerometer data", PERSONAL AND UBIQUITOUS COMPUTING, SPRINGER VERLAG, LO, (20100330), vol. 14, no. 7, ISSN 1617-4917, pages 645 - 662, XP019854311 [A] 4 * page 645, paragraph 1 - page 647, paragraph 2.1.1 * |