EP2991295 - System and method for handling data flows in an access network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [2018/16] |
Former [2016/09] | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kozicki, Bartlomiej Alcatel-Lucent Bell NV Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | 02 /
Tsiaflakis, Paschalis Alcatel-Lucent Bell NV Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | D'Halleweyn, Nele Veerle Trees Gertrudis, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2016/09] | Application number, filing date | 14306323.8 | 27.08.2014 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991295 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/911, H04L12/863 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
H04L47/2433 (EP);
H04L47/6215 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] |
Former [2016/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Behandlung der Datenflüsse in einem Zugangsnetwerk | [2016/09] | English: | System and method for handling data flows in an access network | [2016/09] | French: | Système et procédé pour la gestion de flux de données dans un réseau d' accès | [2016/09] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 07.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/25] | 13.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001026535 (AMOU KENSAKU [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1,3, 7 * * claim 1 *; | [X]US2005047425 (LIU YONGHE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011]; figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US6781971 (DAVIS ROY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]US2002061027 (ABIRU KENICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 4; claim 1 * |