EP3031726 - Wing element for aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zodiac Aerotechnics 61, Rue Pierre Curie 78373 Plaisir Cedex / FR | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Garrec, Stéphane 10 allée Villas Laure 95100 Argenteuil / FR | 02 /
Portier, Philippe 16 Ruelle de la Vignerie 78610 Le Perray en Yvelines / FR | 03 /
Buron, Martial 68, Avenue Charles De Gaulle 78650 Beynes / FR | 04 /
Delehelle, Adao 34 Résidence de la gare 78125 Gazeran / FR | 05 /
Thillays, Bruno 12 rue des Pâquerettes 78650 Beynes / FR | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14306966.4 | 08.12.2014 | [2016/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3031726 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3031726 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B64D15/12 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
B64D15/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] |
Former [2016/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Tragflächenelement für Luftfahrzeug | [2016/24] | English: | Wing element for aircraft | [2016/24] | French: | Elément de voilure pour aéronef | [2016/24] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 11.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2014 | AL | 02.11.2016 | AT | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | DK | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | IT | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | MT | 02.11.2016 | NL | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | RS | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | SM | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | IE | 08.12.2016 | LU | 08.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | NO | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 08.12.2014 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
MT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
TR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.12.2016 | ||
LU | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 08.12.2014 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
MT | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.12.2016 | ||
LU | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 08.12.2014 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.12.2016 | ||
LU | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
IE | 08.12.2016 | ||
LU | 08.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
IT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
DK | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
NL | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RS | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1117843 (ROLLS ROYCE) [A] 1-8 * page 2; figure - *; | [A]EP0749894 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 37 - column 6, line 26; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6283411 (GIAMATI MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-8* column 4, line 60 - column 17, line 56; figure - *; | [A]FR2993241 (MRA SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 5, line 26 - page 12, line 25; figure - * | by applicant | WO2007135383 |