EP3038001 - Method for getting a user validation of a key [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Francis, Lishoy 145 Wilkinson Way CHISWICK, Greater London W4 5XF / GB | 02 /
Hebbes, Luke 9 Sherwood Close LONDON, SW13 0JD / GB | [2016/26] | Application number, filing date | 14307174.4 | 23.12.2014 | [2016/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3038001 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/36 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
G06F21/36 (EP,US);
H04L9/0841 (US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F16/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erhalt einer Benutzervalidierung eines Schlüssels | [2016/26] | English: | Method for getting a user validation of a key | [2016/26] | French: | Procédé pour obtenir la validation d'un utilisateur d'une clé | [2016/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014372754 (AISSI SELIM [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0098] ** claims 1-20 * | by applicant | US4200770 |