EP2952914 - Output current monitoring circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dialog Semiconductor (UK) Limited 100 Longwater Avenue Green Park Reading RG2 6GP / GB | [2016/07] |
Former [2015/50] | For all designated states Dialog Semiconductor GmbH Neue Strasse 95 73230 Kirchheim/Teck-Nabern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozawa, Seiichi 22-35-105, Honcho Wakoh-shi, Saitama, 351-0114 / JP | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes sur Mer / FR | Application number, filing date | 14368026.2 | 06.06.2014 | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2952914 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01R19/00 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
G01R19/0092 (EP,US);
H02M3/1582 (US);
H02M1/0009 (EP,US);
H02M3/158 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] |
Former [2015/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ausgangsstromsüberwachungsschaltung | [2015/50] | English: | Output current monitoring circuit | [2015/50] | French: | Circuit de surveillance de courant de sortie | [2015/50] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/51] | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6946828 (LAYTON KENT D [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005189973 (LI NING [US]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2013271216 (LIU HENGSHENG [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * claims 1-19 * | by applicant | US7301288 | US7986188 | US8026636 | US8612779 | US8627119 | US2003128485 | US2013314062 | US2014015507 |