EP3018496 - Hybrid scintillation module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/19] | HYBRID SCINTILLATION MODULE | ||
[2018/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Equipment for Medical Imaging, S.A. C/Jeronimo de Monsoriu, 92 bajo izda 46022 Valencia / ES | For all designated states WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY 886 Chestnut Ridge Road Morgantown, WV 26506-6845 / US | For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | For all designated states Universitat Politècnica de València Servicio de Promoción y Apoyo a Investigación Innovación y Transferencia Edificio Nexus (6G) - 3° planta Camí de Vera, s/n 46022 Valencia / ES | For all designated states Bruker Switzerland AG Industriestrasse 26 8117 Fällanden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/49] | For all designated states General Equipment for Medical Imaging, S.A. C/Jeronimo de Monsoriu, 92 bajo izda 46022 Valencia / ES | ||
For all designated states WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY 886 Chestnut Ridge Road Morgantown, WV 26506-6845 / US | |||
For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | |||
For all designated states Universitat Politècnica de València Servicio de Promoción y Apoyo a Investigación Innovación y Transferencia Edificio Nexus (6G) - 3° planta Camí de Vera, s/n 46022 Valencia / ES | |||
For all designated states Bruker Switzerland AG Industriestrasse 26 8117 Fällanden / CH | |||
Former [2019/23] | For all designated states General Equipment for Medical Imaging, S.A. C/Jeronimo de Monsoriu, 92 bajo izda 46022 Valencia / ES | ||
For all designated states WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY 886 Chestnut Ridge Road Morgantown, WV 26506-6845 / US | |||
For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | |||
For all designated states Universitat Politècnica de València Servicio de Promoción y Apoyo a Investigación Innovación y Transferencia Edificio Nexus (6G) - 3° planta Camí de Vera, s/n 46022 Valencia / ES | |||
For all designated states Bruker BioSpin AG Industriestrasse 26 8117 Fällanden / CH | |||
Former [2019/14] | For all designated states General Equipment for Medical Imaging, S.A. C/Jeronimo de Monsoriu, 92 bajo izda 46022 Valencia / ES | ||
For all designated states WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY 886 Chestnut Ridge Road Morgantown, WV 26506-6845 / US | |||
For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | |||
For all designated states Universitat Politècnica de València Servicio de Promoción y Apoyo a Investigación Innovación y Transferencia Edificio Nexus (6G) - 3° planta Camí de Vera, s/n 46022 Valencia / ES | |||
Former [2018/09] | For all designated states General Equipment for Medical Imaging, S.A. C/Jeronimo de Monsoriu, 92 bajo izda 46022 Valencia / ES | ||
For all designated states WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY 886 Chestnut Ridge Road Morgantown, WV 26506-6845 / US | |||
For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | |||
For all designated states Universitat Politècnica de València Centro de Transferencia de Tecnología - UPV Camino de Vera, s/n° 46022 Valencia / ES | |||
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states General Equipment for Medical Imaging S.A. (Oncovision) Centro de Investigación Príncipe Felipe C/ Eduardo Primo Yúfera 3, Torre C, planta 3 46013 Valencia / ES | ||
For all designated states WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY 886 Chestnut Ridge Road Morgantown, WV 26506-6845 / US | |||
For all designated states Consejo Superior De Investigaciones Científicas (CSIC) Serrano 117 28006 Madrid / ES | |||
For all designated states Universitat Politècnica de València Centro de Transferencia de Tecnología - UPV Camino de Vera, s/n° 46022 Valencia / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benlloch Baviera, José María Instituto de Instrumentación para Imagen Molecular, I3M Ciudad Politécnica de la Innovación Edificio 8B, Acceso N, 1ª planta 46022 València / ES | 02 /
Gonzalez Martinez, Antonio Javier Instituto de Instrumentación para Imagen Molecular, I3M Camino de Vera, s/n Ciudad Politécnica de la Innovación, Edificio 8B, Acceso N, 1ª planta 46022 Valencia / ES | 03 /
Majewski, Stan 1800 Jefferson Park Ave. Apt.504 Charlottesville, VA Virginia 22903 / US | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Cueto, Sénida SP3 Patents S.L. Los Madroños, 23 28891 Velilla de San Antonio / ES | [2016/19] | Application number, filing date | 14382440.7 | 06.11.2014 | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3018496 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3018496 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/20 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
G01T1/1644 (EP,US);
G01T1/1642 (EP,US);
G01T1/2008 (EP,US);
G01T1/20182 (EP,US);
G01T1/20185 (EP,US);
G01T1/20187 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/19] | G01T1/164, G01T1/29 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2016/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Szintillations-Hybridmodul | [2018/44] | English: | Hybrid scintillation module | [2018/44] | French: | Module hybride à scintillation | [2018/44] |
Former [2016/19] | SZINTILLATIONS-HYBRIDMODUL | ||
Former [2016/19] | HYBRID SCINTILLATION MODULE | ||
Former [2016/19] | MODULE HYBRIDE À SCINTILLATION | Examination procedure | 06.11.2014 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 01.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2014 | AL | 05.06.2019 | AT | 05.06.2019 | CY | 05.06.2019 | CZ | 05.06.2019 | DK | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | FI | 05.06.2019 | GR | 05.06.2019 | HR | 05.06.2019 | IT | 05.06.2019 | LT | 05.06.2019 | LV | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | MK | 05.06.2019 | MT | 05.06.2019 | NL | 05.06.2019 | PL | 05.06.2019 | RO | 05.06.2019 | RS | 05.06.2019 | SE | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SK | 05.06.2019 | SM | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | NO | 05.09.2019 | IS | 05.10.2019 | PT | 07.10.2019 | IE | 06.11.2019 | LU | 06.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
GR | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
MT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 06.11.2014 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
GR | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/30] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
GR | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 05.06.2019 | |
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 05.06.2019 | |
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5861628 (GENNA SEBASTIAN [US], et al) [Y] 4* figure 5 *; | [XYI]CN102707310B (RAYCAN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD SUZHOU) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10,13,16,18,19 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] * * figures 1, 2, 5, 6 * [Y] 4 [I] 8,11,12,14,15,17,20 | Examination | - ZHANG H ET AL, "Performance Characteristics of BGO Detectors for a Low Cost Preclinical PET Scanner", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20100601), vol. 57, no. 3, ISSN 0018-9499, pages 1038 - 1044, XP011311667 | by applicant | US3978336 | US6713767 | US6819738 | US6946841 | US7692156 | - MIKIKO ITO; SEONG JONG HONG; JAE SUNG LEE, "Positron Emission Tomography (PET) Detectors with Depth-of- Interaction (DOI) Capability", BIOMED ENG LETT, (2011), vol. 1, pages 70 - 81 | - JAE SUNG LEE, "Technical Advances in Current PET and Hybrid Imaging Systems", THE OPEN NUCLEAR MEDICINE JOURNAL, (2010), vol. 2, pages 192 - 20 | - THOMAS K. LEWELLEN, "The Challenge of Detector Designs for PET", AJR, (2010), vol. 195, pages 01 - 309 | - HAO PENG; CRAIG S. LEVIN, "Recent Developments in PET Instrumentation", CURRENT PHARMACEUTICAL BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 11, pages 555 - 571 | - CRAIG S. LEVIN, "New Imaging Technologies to Enhance the Molecular Sensitivity of Positron Emission Tomography", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (200803), vol. 96, no. 3, pages 439 - 467, XP011204270 |