EP2842535 - Gravity scoliosis correction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salperte Sp. z o.o. Troniny 5 42-165 Lipie / PL | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kluszczynski, Marek Troniny 5 42-165 Lipie / PL | [2015/10] | Representative(s) | Wozniak, Jolanta Kancelaria Rzecznikowska Patent Ul. Bobrzynskiego 31A/1 30-348 Kraków / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Korbela, Anna ul. Kilinskiego 30 lok. 2 42-202 Czestochowa / PL | Application number, filing date | 14460043.4 | 23.07.2014 | [2015/10] | Priority number, date | PL20130404826 | 23.07.2013 Original published format: PL 40482613 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2842535 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/02 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
A61H1/0292 (EP);
A61H1/008 (EP);
A61H1/0229 (EP);
A61H2201/1253 (EP);
A61H2201/1623 (EP);
A61H2201/1642 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] |
Former [2015/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Korrektur von Schwerkraft-Skoliose | [2015/10] | English: | Gravity scoliosis correction device | [2015/10] | French: | Dispositif de correction de la scoliose par gravité | [2015/10] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 04.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 27.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3568669 (STITES JOSEPH D) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, line 72 - column 2, line 9; column 3, line 71 - column 5, line 2; figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]KR20040049978 (YOO GIL SANG) [Y] 1-3,5,6 * abstract *; | [Y]DE10253630 (LUZ HELMUT [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [A]US4207879 (SAFADAGO GARY J [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US2006248650 (SKRIPPS THOMAS K [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]KR20080102771 (HBT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | PL60060Y | PL176238B | PL391612 |