EP2983116 - Method and system for collecting commodity consumption data and method and system for generating an offer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lepszaoferta.PL S.A. Makuszynsklego 4 31-752 Krakow / PL | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slowiakowski, Pawel LEPSZAOFERTA.PL S.A. Makuszynskiego 4 31-752 Krakow / PL | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Kancelaria Eupatent.pl Sp. z.o.o Ul. Kilinskiego 185 90-348 Lodz / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/06] | Eupatent.pl ul. Zeligowskiego 3/5 90-752 Lodz / PL | Application number, filing date | 14461558.0 | 08.08.2014 | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2983116 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q30/06, G06Q50/06, G06Q30/02 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0611 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0201 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0282 (EP,US);
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
G06Q30/08 (EP,US);
G06Q50/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Sammlung von Verbrauchsdaten sowie Verfahren und System zur Erzeugung eines Angebots | [2016/06] | English: | Method and system for collecting commodity consumption data and method and system for generating an offer | [2016/06] | French: | Procédé et système pour collecter des données de consommation de produits et procédé et système de génération d'une offre | [2016/06] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 19.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008154704 (FLAKE GARY W [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10-12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0 28] , [0 41] , [0085]; figures 1,2,11 *[I] 6-9,13 | by applicant | WO2009111364 |