EP2899175 - METHOD OF PREPARATION OF NANOPOROUS CARBON MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/31] | THE METHOD OF PREPARATION OF NANOPOROUS CARBON MATERIALS | ||
[2018/28] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zachodniopomorski Uniwersytet Technologiczny w Szczecinie Aleja Piastów 17 70-310 Szczecin / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states Zachodniopomorski Uniwersytet Technologiczny w Szczecinie Aleja Piastów 17 70-310 Szczecin / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Michalkiewicz, Beata Zachodniopomorski Uniwersytet Technologiczny w Szczecinie Klonowica 11b/24 71-244 Szczecin / PL | 02 /
Majewska, Justyna Zachodniopomorski Uniwersytet Technologiczny w Szczecinie ul. Herbowa 30/1 71-427 Szczecin / PL | 03 /
Mlodzik, Jacek Zachodniopomorski Uniwersytet Technologiczny w Szczecinie Borowo 9 78-540 Kalisz Pomorski / PL | 04 /
Michalkiewicz, Kamila Zachodniopomorski Uniwersytet Technologiczny w Szczecinie ul. Santocka 33/18 71-083 Szczecin / PL | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Zawadzka, Renata Zachodniopomorski Uniwersytet Technologiczny w Szczecinie Dziel Wynalazczosci i Ochrony Patentowej al. Piastow 17 70-310 Szczecin / PL | [2015/31] | Application number, filing date | 14461593.7 | 27.11.2014 | [2015/31] | Priority number, date | PL20140406919 | 24.01.2014 Original published format: PL 40691914 | [2015/31] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899175 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/528, C04B35/532, C04B38/00 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
C04B35/528 (EP);
C04B35/14 (EP);
C04B35/532 (EP);
C04B35/62204 (EP);
C04B35/6316 (EP);
C04B35/638 (EP);
C04B38/0022 (EP);
C04B2111/00793 (EP);
C04B2111/0081 (EP);
C04B2111/00853 (EP);
C04B2235/3418 (EP);
C04B2235/48 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0022, C04B35/52, C04B38/0054, C04B38/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | 10.12.2014 | ME | 10.12.2014 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung nanoporöser Kohlenstoffmaterialien | [2018/28] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARATION OF NANOPOROUS CARBON MATERIALS | [2018/28] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation des produits à base de carbone nanoporeux | [2018/28] |
Former [2015/31] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG NANOPORÖSER KOHLENSTOFFMATERIALIEN | ||
Former [2015/31] | THE METHOD OF PREPARATION OF NANOPOROUS CARBON MATERIALS | ||
Former [2015/31] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION DES PRODUITS À BASE DE CARBONE NANOPOREUX | Examination procedure | 10.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 16.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/32] | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2012136513 (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS [DE], et al) [I] 1-4 * page 7, line 20 - line 25 * * page 17, line 17 - page 20, line 2 * * example 1 ** claims 1-16 * | by applicant | - T. KYOTANI, CARBON, (2000), vol. 38, page 269 | - ZAKIDOV ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, page 897 | - S.B.YOON ET AL., J MATER CHEM, (2007), vol. 17, page 1758 | - S. HAN; T. HYEON, CARBON, (1999), vol. 37, page 1645 | - S. HAN ET AL., CHEM. MATER, (2000), vol. 12, page 3337 | - Z. LI, M. JARONIEC, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2001), vol. 123, page 9208 | - Z. LI, M. JARONIEC, CARBON, (2001), vol. 39, page 2080 | - W. W. LUKENS; G. D. STUCKY, CHEM. MATER., (2002), vol. 14, page 1665 | - J. JANG; B. LIM, ADV. MATER., (2002), vol. 14, page 1390 | - D. KAWASHIMA ET AL., CHEM. MATER., (2000), vol. 12, page 3397 | - S.V. MAYANI ET AL., MATERIALS LETTERS, (2012), vol. 82, page 120 | - A. MONNIER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, page 1299 | - P.T. TANEV ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 267, page 865 | - J.CHOMA ET AL., OCHRONA SRODOWISKA, (2008), vol. 30, page 3 | - J.H. KNOX ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR., (1986), vol. 352, page 3 | - A. B. FUERTES; S. ALVAREZ, CARBON, (2004), vol. 42, page 3049 | - T. - W. KIM ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. IND. ED., (2003), vol. 42, page 4375 | - C. H. KIM ET AL., LANGMUIR, (2004), vol. 20, page 5157 | - C. VIX - GUTERL ET AL., CHEM. LETT., (2002), page 1062 | - M. KANNEDA ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (2002), vol. 106, page 1256 | - W. - H. ZHANG ET AL., ADV. MATER., (2002), vol. 14, page 1776 | - Y. D. XIA; R. MOKAYA, ADV. MATER., (2004), vol. 16, page 886 | - Y. D. XIA; R. MOKAYA, ADV. MATER., (2004), vol. 16, page 1553 | - A. B. FUERTES; D. M. NEVSKAIA, J. MATER. CHEM., (2003), vol. 13, page 1843 | - NANOSCALE, (2011), vol. 3, no. 4, page 1632 |