EP2918687 - Product and process for obtaining of chrome free leather [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institutul National de Cercetare - Dezvoltare pentru Textile si Pielarie - Sucursala Institutul de Cercetari Pielarie Incaltaminte Str. Ion Minulescu 93, sector 3 031215 Bucuresti / RO | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crudu, Marian Prelungirea Ghencea nr.36, bl.D 4, sc.A, ap.3 sector 6 Bucuresti / RO | 02 /
Deselnicu, Viorica Doamna Chiajna nr.25, ap.2. sector 3 Bucuresti / RO | 03 /
Albu, Florica Luminita Calea Ferentari, 23, Bl. 129B, sc. 3, et. 4, ap. 82, sector 5 Bucuresti / RO | 04 /
Deselnicu, Dana Corina Doamna Chiajna nr.25, ap.2. sector 3 Bucuresti / RO | 05 /
Crudu, Andra Manuela Prelungirea Ghencea nr.36, bl.D 4, sc.A ap.3,sector 6 Bucuresti / RO | [2015/38] | Application number, filing date | 14464004.2 | 14.03.2014 | [2015/38] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2017/14] |
Former [2015/38] | RO20140000191 | 10.03.2014 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2918687 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C14C3/04 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
C14C3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Produkt und Verfahren zur Herstellung von chromfreiem Leder | [2015/38] | English: | Product and process for obtaining of chrome free leather | [2015/38] | French: | Produit et procédé de production de cuir exempt de chrome | [2015/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2014 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 30.10.2015 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 18.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2016 | 31.03.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2017 | 31.03.2019 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2019 | 31.03.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101016572 (UNIV SICHUAN [CN]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US4334876 (BEIER WILLIAM C, et al) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 * | [A] - CRUDU MARIAN ET AL, "Valorization of titanium metal wastes as tanning agent used in leather industry", WASTE MANAGEMENT, (20140206), vol. 34, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.WASMAN.2013.12.015, ISSN 0956-053X, pages 1806 - 1814, XP029054112 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.wasman.2013.12.015 | by applicant | CN101033494 | RU2112809 | RU2103372 | JP2006213915 | IT1262542 | EP0290143 | RO103051 | RO103050 |