EP2954244 - A MAGNETIC VALVE WITH AN ARMATURE ARRANGED INSIDE A PISTON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danfoss A/S Nordborgvej 81 6430 Nordborg / DK | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRKELUND, Michael Alroevaenget 8 DK-5500 Middelfart / DK | 02 /
BEEK, Johan van Stagebjergparken 108 DK-6051 Almind / DK | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 14700322.2 | 03.01.2014 | [2015/51] | WO2014DK50001 | Priority number, date | DK20130000080 | 11.02.2013 Original published format: DK 201300080 | [2015/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014121796 | Date: | 14.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2954244 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/40 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
F16K31/408 (EP,CN,US);
F16K31/0668 (US);
F16K3/0218 (US);
F16K31/0648 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Title | German: | MAGNETVENTIL MIT EINEM ANKER IN EINEM KOLBEN | [2015/51] | English: | A MAGNETIC VALVE WITH AN ARMATURE ARRANGED INSIDE A PISTON | [2015/51] | French: | VANNE MAGNÉTIQUE COMPRENANT UNE ARMATURE DISPOSÉE À L'INTÉRIEUR D'UN PISTON | [2015/51] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 30.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 04.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1168725 (ERICH HERION) [X] 1-12 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB1138017 (ITT) [X] 1-12 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3428096 (IMP CLEVITE INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US5205531 (KOLCHINSKY ABEL E [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [X]US5735582 (EITH HUBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]DE10311486 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [A]WO2009000271 (DANFOSS AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | US6021997 |