EP2943800 - AN OPTICALLY GUIDED MICRODEVICE COMPRISING A NANOWIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet Anker Engelundsvej 1 Bygning 101 A 2800 Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet Anker Engelundsvej 1 Bygning 101 A 2800 Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLÜCKSTAD, Jesper N. Dalhoffs Vej 5 DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 14700427.9 | 10.01.2014 | [2015/47] | WO2014DK50004 | Priority number, date | EP20130150969 | 11.01.2013 Original published format: EP 13150969 | US201361751691P | 11.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361751691 P | [2015/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014108135 | Date: | 17.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2943800 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01Q60/22, G02B23/26, G01Q60/18 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
G01Q60/22 (EP,US);
G01Q70/12 (EP,US);
G02B21/32 (EP,US);
G02B23/26 (EP,US);
B82Y15/00 (US);
B82Y20/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] | Title | German: | OPTISCH GESTEUERTE MIKROVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM NANODRAHT | [2015/47] | English: | AN OPTICALLY GUIDED MICRODEVICE COMPRISING A NANOWIRE | [2015/47] | French: | MICRODISPOSITIF À GUIDAGE OPTIQUE COMPRENANT UN NANOFIL | [2015/47] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 29.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2012155919 (UNIV DANMARKS TEKNISKE [DK], et al) [AD] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006008550 (COUNCILS COUNCIL FOR THE CENTR [GB], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A] - D. PALIMA ET AL, "Wave-guided optical waveguides", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20120130), vol. 20, no. 3, doi:10.1364/OE.20.002004, ISSN 1094-4087, page 2004, XP055029658 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.20.002004 | by applicant | WO2007079411 | WO2012155919 | WO2006008550 | - D. PALIMA; A. R. BANAS; G. VIZSNYICZAI; L. KELEMEN; P. ORMOS; J. GLÜCKSTAD, "Wave-guided optical waveguides", OPTICS EXPRESS, (2012), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 2004 - 2014 | - G. GREZELA ET AL., "Nanowire antenna emission", OPTICS LETTER, (201211), vol. 12, no. 11, pages 5481 - 6 | - PRABBAT VERMA ET AL., LASER PHOTONICS REV., (2010), vol. 4, no. 4, pages 548 - 561 | - RODRIGO ET AL., "Optical microassembly platform for constructing reconfigurable microenvironments for biomedical studies", OPTICS EXPRESS, (2009), vol. 17, pages 6578 - 6583 | - SHOTA FUKADA, "3D Fabrication and Manipulation of Hybrid Nanorobots by Laser", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION (ICRA, (20130506), pages 2594 - 2599 | - III. FABRICATION PROCESS OF NANOROBOT, page 2595 | - IV. FABRICATION AND MANIPULATION OF NANOROBOT, pages 2596 - 2597 | - NAKAYAMA ET AL., NATURE, (20070628), page 447 | - H. U. ULRIKSEN ET AL., "Independent trapping, manipulation and characterization by an all-optical biophotonics workstation", J. EUROP. OPT. SOC. RAP. PUBLIC., (2008), vol. 3, page 08034 | - M. PADGETT; R. LEONARDO, "Holographic optical tweezers and their relevance to lab on chip devices", LAB CHIP, (2011), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1039/c0lc00526f, page 1196, XP055000534 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0lc00526f | - PALIMA ET AL., "Wave-guided optical waveguides", OPTICS EXPRESS, (2012), vol. 20, pages 2004 - 2014 | - S. T. HUNTINGTON ET AL., "A fractal-based fibre for ultra-high throughput optical probes", OPTICS EXPRESS, (20070305), vol. 15, no. 5, page 2468 | - FRANZ SCHBERTS ET AL., "Square fibers solve multiple application challenges", PHOTONICS SPECTRA, vol. 45, no. 2, pages 38 - 41, XP008139471 | - D. K. GRAMOTNEV; S. I. BOZHEVOLNYI, "Plasmonics beyond the diffraction limit", NATURE PHOTONICS, (2010), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/nphoton.2009.282, pages 83 - 91, XP007911388 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nphoton.2009.282 | - PLASMON NANOFOCUSING, pages 85 - 86 | - YURI NAKAYAMA ET AL., NATURE, (20070628), vol. 447 |