EP2945825 - PREDICTING A DRIVING MANEUVER OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2015/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLANNER, Felix 91 Nanyang View 639664 Singapore / SG | 02 /
KLÖDEN, Horst Agnesstraße 58 80797 München / DE | 03 /
LIEBNER, Martin Franz-Fihl-Str. 3 80992 München / DE | [2015/48] | Application number, filing date | 14700989.8 | 15.01.2014 | [2015/48] | WO2014EP50673 | Priority number, date | DE201310200724 | 18.01.2013 Original published format: DE102013200724 | [2015/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014111408 | Date: | 24.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2945825 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/095, G08G1/16 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
B60W40/105 (EP);
B60W40/107 (EP);
B60W50/0097 (EP);
G08G1/16 (EP);
G08G1/166 (EP);
G08G1/167 (EP);
B60W2552/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Title | German: | VORHERSAGE EINES FAHRMANÖVERS EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2015/48] | English: | PREDICTING A DRIVING MANEUVER OF A VEHICLE | [2015/48] | French: | PRÉVISION D'UNE MANOEUVRE DE CONDUITE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2015/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 18.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 30.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP2537727 (VOLVO CAR CORP [SE]) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1, 4 *; | [Y]US2012203440 (MATSUNAGA MASAKI [JP]) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1, 2 * | [Y] - MARTIN LIEBNER ET AL, "Driver intent inference at urban intersections using the intelligent driver model", INTELLIGENT VEHICLES SYMPOSIUM (IV), 2012 IEEE, IEEE, (20120603), doi:10.1109/IVS.2012.6232131, ISBN 978-1-4673-2119-8, pages 1162 - 1167, XP032452922 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IVS.2012.6232131 | Examination | - Wael K.M. Alhajyaseen ET AL, "Estimation of left-turning vehicle maneuvers for the assessment of pedestrian safety at intersections", IATSS Research, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20120701), vol. 36, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.iatssr.2012.03.002, ISSN 0386-1112, pages 66 - 74, XP055534059 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.iatssr.2012.03.002 | by applicant | - "Driver Intent Interface at Urban Intersections using the Intelligent Driver Model", IEEE INTELLIGENT VEHIDE SYMPOSIUM, (201206), pages 1162 - 1167 |