EP2953730 - DEVICE FOR WET-TREATING THE LOWER FACE OF SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Schmid GmbH Robert-Bosch-Strasse 32-36 72250 Freudenstadt / DE | [2015/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜCK, Philip Mozartstrasse 5 72250 Freudenstadt / DE | 02 /
NIETHAMMER, Michael Forstweg 12 75365 Calw / DE | 03 /
WEISSER, Kai Faerberstraße 57 78050 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/51] | Application number, filing date | 14701518.4 | 23.01.2014 | [2015/51] | WO2014EP51319 | Priority number, date | DE201310202138 | 08.02.2013 Original published format: DE102013202138 | [2015/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014122027 | Date: | 14.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2953730 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/06, H01L21/677, H01L21/67, B05C13/02, B05C1/08, B05C1/02 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
B05C1/0821 (EP,US);
B05C1/025 (EP,US);
B05C13/02 (EP,US);
H01L21/67057 (EP,US);
H01L21/6776 (EP,US);
H05K3/06 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/51] | B05C1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSEITIGEN SUBSTRATNASSBEHANDLUNG | [2015/51] | English: | DEVICE FOR WET-TREATING THE LOWER FACE OF SUBSTRATES | [2015/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT PAR VOIE HUMIDE DE LA FACE INFÉRIEURE DE SUBSTRATS | [2015/51] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 27.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2118700 (PUCCI LUIGI) [A] 1 * page 4, line 3 - page 6, line 39; figure - *; | [A]DE3214655 (VALTORTA FLLI [IT]) [A] 1* page 11, line 9 - page 17, line 7; figure - *; | [AD]DE102005062527 (SCHMID GMBH & CO GEB [DE]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036]; figure - * | by applicant | DE10128386 | DE102005062527 | DE102005062528 | DE102011081981 |