EP2953999 - RIGID POLYSTYRENE FOAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.11.2021 [2021/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frohs, Wilhelm Gartenstraße 6 86695 Allmannshofen / DE | [2020/08] |
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states SGL Carbon SE Söhnleinstrasse 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROHS Wilhelm Gartenstraße 6 86695 Allmannshofen 6 / DE | 02 /
HANDL Werner Fussstr. 3a 90518 Altdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | 01 /
FROHS, Wilhelm Gartenstrasse 6 86695 Allmannshofen / DE | ||
02 /
HANDL, Werner Fussstr. 3a 90518 Altdorf / DE | Representative(s) | Botzenhardt, Sandra SGL Carbon SE Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 18 86405 Meitingen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 14702860.9 | 05.02.2014 | [2015/51] | WO2014EP52274 | Priority number, date | DE201310201844 | 05.02.2013 Original published format: DE102013201844 | [2015/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014122190 | Date: | 14.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2953999 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, C08L25/06, C08K3/04, C08J9/14, C08J9/16, C08J9/232 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
C08J9/0019 (EP,US);
C08J9/0038 (EP,US);
C08J9/0066 (EP,US);
C08J9/0095 (EP,US);
C08J9/141 (EP,US);
C08J9/16 (EP,US);
C08J9/20 (EP,US);
C08J9/232 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/0066 (EP,US);
C08K5/02 (EP,US);
C08K5/49 (EP,US);
C08J2201/03 (EP,US);
C08J2201/034 (EP,US);
C08J2203/14 (EP,US);
C08J2205/052 (EP,US);
C08J2205/10 (EP,US);
C08J2325/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L25/06 (EP,US);
C08K5/0066, C08L25/06 (US,EP);
C08K5/02, C08L25/06 (US,EP);
C08K5/49, C08L25/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Title | German: | POLYSTYROLHARTSCHAUMSTOFFE | [2015/51] | English: | RIGID POLYSTYRENE FOAMS | [2015/51] | French: | MOUSSES DE POLYSTYRÈNE | [2015/51] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 24.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2016 | Observations by third parties | 01.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2017 | Observations by third parties | 31.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2018 | Observations by third parties | 23.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/46] | 17.04.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.10.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/46] | Appeal following examination | 27.06.2018 | Appeal received No. T2237/18 | 27.08.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.09.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 01.10.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 07.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2009135695 (POLIMERI EUROPA SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * page 1, line 10 - line 20 * * page 4, line 2 - page 7, line 16 * * page 9, line 11 - page 11, line 17 *[I] 3; | [XD]WO2010031537 (H C CARBON GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * page 3, line 23 - page 6, line 18 * * example - * | by applicant | EP0620246 | WO9745477 | WO9851734 | WO0043442 | WO2010031537 | DE202010013850U | DE202010013851U | - MAIRE; MEHRING, Proc. of the 4th Conf. On Carbon, PERGAMON PRESS, (1960), pages 345 - 350 | other | WO2010031537 | DE202010013850U | WO9745477 | PL383645 | PL384435 | PL212329B | PL407902 | WO2016113338 | WO2016113332 | WO2016113328 | WO2016113321 | EP3087127 | EP3087125 | EP3087126 | - FRANK R. FERET, "Determination of the crystallinity of calcined and graphitic cokes by x-ray diffraction", Analyst, (19980400), vol. 123, pages 595 - 600, XP055339801 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/a707845e | - Winterling H. et al., "Rigid Polystyrene Foam (EPS, XPS)", Kunststoffe, (20111000), vol. 10, pages 18 - 21, XP055339806 | - "FOAMULAR® Extruded Polystyrene (XPS) Insulation SI and I-P Units for Selected Properties", Owens Corning Technical Bulletin, (20110900), URL: http://www.commercial.owenscorning.com/assets/0/144/172/174/1fb2fb08-5923-46de-b387-f4bdc3f68d50.pdf, XP055339809 | - WINNACKER & KUCHLER, Chemische Technologie, Band 3, Anorganische Technologie II, 4. auflage, Carl Hanser Verlag, (19830000), vol. 3, pages 283 - 285, XP002950081 |