EP2943779 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR STATISTICAL MEASUREMENT CONTROL OF SPECTROPHOTOMETRIC DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2015/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORRIS, Alison M. 1499 Peach Drive Avon, Ohio 44011 / US | [2015/47] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2023/01] |
Former [2015/47] | f & e patent Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 14702970.6 | 08.01.2014 | [2015/47] | WO2014US10608 | Priority number, date | US201313737179 | 09.01.2013 Original published format: US201313737179 | [2015/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014110087 | Date: | 17.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2943779 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2943779 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/46, G01N21/84, G01N21/25, G01N21/88, G01J3/50 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
G01J3/504 (EP,US);
G01N21/55 (US);
G01J3/462 (EP,US);
G01N21/255 (EP,US);
G01N21/8422 (EP,US);
G01N21/8851 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/47] | G01N21/84, G01N21/88, G01N21/25, G01J3/50, G06F17/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR STATISTISCHEN MESSUNGSSTEUERUNG SPEKTROFOTOMETRISCHER DATEN | [2015/47] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR STATISTICAL MEASUREMENT CONTROL OF SPECTROPHOTOMETRIC DATA | [2015/47] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE DE MESURE STATISTIQUE DE DONNÉES DE SPECTROPHOTOMÉTRIE | [2015/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/47] | 12.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2019 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | ES | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | IT | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | IE | 08.01.2023 | LU | 08.01.2023 | BE | 31.01.2023 | FR | 04.03.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IE | 08.01.2023 | ||
LU | 08.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
FR | 04.03.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IE | 08.01.2023 | ||
LU | 08.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 08.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 08.01.2023 | ||
BE | 31.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 08.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 08.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 08.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5606164 (PRICE JOHN F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,12 * column 1, lines 15,19-21,44-58 * * column 2, lines 41-54 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, lines 19-42 * * column 5, lines 16-25 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 4 * * column 11, line 65 - column 12, line 13 *; | [XI]WO2009065956 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,10-13 * page 1, line 8 * * page 1, line 32 - page 2, line 3 * * page 8, lines 1-31 * * page 25, lines 19-31 * * page 26, lines 7-15 * * page 28, lines 4-11 * * page 29, line 4 - page 31, line 4 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 5-9; | [X]DE102008009302 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,4,10,12* paragraphs [0004] - [0007] * | Examination | US2009213120 |