EP2956429 - PROCESS AND PLANT FOR PRODUCING OLEFINS FROM OXYGENATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75 quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTHAEMEL, Martin Egerländer Straße 21 60437 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
OLINDO, Roberta Berger Marktplatz 8 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
HAAG, Stéphane Tucholskystr. 59 60598 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 04 /
RENNER, Thomas Nordendstraße 55 60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 05 /
CASTILLO-WELTER, Frank Obere Römerhofstraße 154 61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Dropsch, Holger Air Liquide Forschung und Entwicklung GmbH Gwinnerstraße 27-33 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2015/52] | Application number, filing date | 14703063.9 | 04.02.2014 | [2015/52] | WO2014EP52165 | Priority number, date | DE201310101578 | 18.02.2013 Original published format: DE102013101578 | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014124845 | Date: | 21.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2956429 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2956429 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C1/20, C07C11/06, C10G29/20, C10G45/44, C10G57/00, C10G3/00, C10G9/00 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
C07C1/20 (EP,US);
B01J19/245 (US);
C07C5/10 (US);
C07C6/04 (US);
C10G11/02 (EP,US);
C10G3/42 (EP,US);
C10G45/44 (EP,US);
C10G69/04 (EP,US);
B01J2219/24 (US);
| C-Set: |
C07C1/20, C07C11/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OLEFINEN AUS OXYGENATEN | [2015/52] | English: | PROCESS AND PLANT FOR PRODUCING OLEFINS FROM OXYGENATES | [2015/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION D'OLÉFINES À PARTIR DE COMPOSÉS OXYGÉNÉS | [2015/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 11.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.02.2014 | AL | 31.01.2018 | AT | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | CZ | 31.01.2018 | DK | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | ES | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | IT | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | NL | 31.01.2018 | PL | 31.01.2018 | PT | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SE | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | TR | 31.01.2018 | IE | 04.02.2018 | LU | 04.02.2018 | MT | 04.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | NO | 30.04.2018 | GR | 01.05.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 04.02.2014 | |
AL | 31.01.2018 | ||
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
MT | 04.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
MT | 04.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
MT | 04.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
MT | 04.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
IE | 04.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2006161035 (KALNES TOM N [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,12,13 * claims 1,21,34 * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0068] * [A] 9-11 [I] 3,4,6-8; | [AD]WO2006136433 (LURGI AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1,13 * figure 1 ** page 9, line 23 - page 12, line 12 * | by applicant | US4482772 | US4543435 | US2004039239 | WO2006136433 | DE102005048931 | US2007284284 | WO2011131647 |