EP2946313 - SEARCHING AND DETERMINING ACTIVE AREA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 13.07.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 Grand Cayman / KY | [2015/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Shitian C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/f Building 3 No. 969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou 311121 / CN | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/48] | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14704000.0 | 17.01.2014 | [2015/48] | WO2014US12104 | Priority number, date | CN2013119989 | 18.01.2013 Original published format: CN201310019989 | [2015/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014113709 | Date: | 24.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2946313 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
G06F16/29 (EP,US);
G06F16/245 (US);
G06F16/24578 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Title | German: | DURCHSUCHUNG UND BESTIMMUNG AKTIVER FLÄCHEN | [2015/48] | English: | SEARCHING AND DETERMINING ACTIVE AREA | [2015/48] | French: | RECHERCHE ET DÉTERMINATION DE ZONE ACTIVE | [2015/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 12.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/33] | 12.07.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2018 | 07.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002059273 (MORIMOTO YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2011081912 (MAPQUEST INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0042] *; | [I] - WEI WANG ET AL, "STING: a statistical information grid approach to spatial data mining", PROCEEDINGS OF VLDB 97: 23RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON VERY LARGE DATABASES - 26-29 AUG. 1997 - ATHENS, GREECE,, (19970826), ISBN 978-1-55860-470-4, pages 186 - 195, XP009117379 [I] 1-20 * page 186, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 188, column l, paragraph last - column r, paragraph last; figure 1 * * page 189, column r, paragraph last - page 190, column r, paragraph last; figure 2 * | [A] - GEORGE LAMPRIANIDIS ET AL, "Jeocrowd", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 19TH ACM SIGSPATIAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ADVANCES IN GEOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SYSTEMS, GIS '11, New York, New York, USA, (20111101), doi:10.1145/2093973.2094061, ISBN 978-1-45-031031-4, pages 509 - 512, XP055134878 [A] 1-20 * page 509, column l, paragraph 1 - page 511, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2093973.2094061 | [A] - Weining Qian ET AL, "Clustering in very large databases based on distance and density", Journal of Computer Science and Technology, Beijing, doi:10.1007/BF02946652, (20030101), pages 67 - 76, URL: http://search.proquest.com/docview/884704937, (20140814), XP055134879 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 67 - page 70 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02946652 |