EP2950819 - INTRADERMAL DELIVERY OF IMMUNOLOGICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING TOLL-LIKE RECEPTOR AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALLORINI, Simona Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 02 /
BAUDNER, Barbara Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l Via Fiorentina 1 I-53100 Siena / IT | 03 /
O'HAGAN, Derek Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics,Inc 350 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Dalton, Marcus Jonathan William GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2015/50] | Application number, filing date | 14704537.1 | 30.01.2014 | [2015/50] | WO2014EP51860 | Priority number, date | US201361759751P | 01.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361759751 P | EP20130169596 | 28.05.2013 Original published format: EP 13169596 | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014118305 | Date: | 07.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2950819 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2950819 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39, A61K39/02, A61K39/095, A61K9/00 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K9/0021 (US);
A61K39/095 (US);
A61K39/145 (US);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55511 (US);
A61K2039/55544 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55572 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/50] | A61K39/39 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRADERMALE ABGABE VON IMMUNOLOGISCHEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT TOLL-LIKE-REZEPTOR-AGONISTEN | [2015/50] | English: | INTRADERMAL DELIVERY OF IMMUNOLOGICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING TOLL-LIKE RECEPTOR AGONISTS | [2015/50] | French: | ADMINISTRATION INTRADERMIQUE DE COMPOSITIONS IMMUNOLOGIQUES COMPRENANT DES AGONISTES DES RÉCEPTEURS DE TYPE TOLL | [2015/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 01.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2014 | AL | 28.03.2018 | AT | 28.03.2018 | CY | 28.03.2018 | CZ | 28.03.2018 | DK | 28.03.2018 | EE | 28.03.2018 | FI | 28.03.2018 | HR | 28.03.2018 | LT | 28.03.2018 | LV | 28.03.2018 | MC | 28.03.2018 | MK | 28.03.2018 | PL | 28.03.2018 | RO | 28.03.2018 | RS | 28.03.2018 | SE | 28.03.2018 | SI | 28.03.2018 | SK | 28.03.2018 | SM | 28.03.2018 | BG | 28.06.2018 | NO | 28.06.2018 | GR | 29.06.2018 | IS | 28.07.2018 | PT | 30.07.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.01.2014 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IS | 28.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IS | 28.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
DK | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
CZ | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
PL | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
SK | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
FI | 28.03.2018 | ||
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
LV | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SE | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 28.03.2018 | |
HR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO02085446 (ALZA CORP [US]) [Y] 1,8-11 * page 3, paragraph 0009 - page 5, paragraph 00013 * * page 9, paragraph 00033 - page 12, paragraph 00039; example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2011151723 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1,8-11 * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 29 * * page 11, line 24 - line 28 * * page 20, line 25 - line 32 *; | [X] - PATTANI ADITYA ET AL, "Microneedle mediated intradermal delivery of adjuvanted recombinant HIV-1 CN54gp140 effectively primes mucosal boost inoculations", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (201209), vol. 162, no. 3, pages 529 - 537, XP002715004 [X] 1,9-11 * page 529, column r, paragraph 1 - page 530, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 530, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 534, column l, paragraph 2 - page 535, column r, paragraph 1 * * page 536, column l, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2012.07.039 | [X] - DEMUTH P ET AL, "Engineered microneedle arrays for transcutaneous HIV vaccine delivery", RETROVIROLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD., LONDON, GB, (20120913), vol. 9, no. Suppl 2, doi:10.1186/1742-4690-9-S2-P334, ISSN 1742-4690, page P334, XP021116574 [X] 1,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1742-4690-9-S2-P334 | [XP] - GUO LEI ET AL, "Enhanced transcutaneous immunization via dissolving microneedle array loaded with liposome encapsulated antigen and adjuvant", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS (KIDLINGTON), (201304), vol. 447, no. 1-2, pages 22 - 30, XP002715005 [XP] 1,9 * page 22, column r, paragraph 2 - page 23, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 23, column l, paragraph 4 * * page 24, column l, paragraph 3 - column r, paragraph 3 * * page 28, column r, paragraph 2 - page 29, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijpharm.2013.02.006 | [A] - ELSA E KIS ET AL, "Devices for intradermal vaccination", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 30, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2011.11.020, ISSN 0264-410X, (20111106), pages 523 - 538, (20111111), XP028348164 [A] 1,8-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2011.11.020 | Examination | US2011053893 | - WELDON WILLIAM C ET AL, "Effect of Adjuvants on Responses to Skin Immunization by Microneedles Coated with Influenza Subunit Vaccine", PLOS ONE, (201207), vol. 7, no. 7, ISSN 1932-6203(print), page Article No.: e41501 | - MITSUI HIROSHI ET AL, "Differential expression and function of Toll-like receptors in Langerhans cells: Comparison with splenic dendritic cells.", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (200401), vol. 122, no. 1, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 95 - 102 | - SUZUKI HIROTAKE ET AL, "Imiquimod, a topical immune response modifier, induces migration of Langerhans cells", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (200001), vol. 114, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1523-1747.2000.00833.x, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 135 - 141, XP002964631 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1747.2000.00833.x | by applicant | US4057685 | US4356170 | US4459286 | EP0208375 | US4663160 | US4666886 | US4673574 | US4695624 | US4761283 | US4808700 | US4882317 | GB2220211 | EP0372501 | EP0378881 | US4965338 | WO9101146 | EP0427347 | EP0471177 | WO9313202 | WO9317712 | WO9403208 | EP0594610 | WO9517211 | WO9737026 | WO9743303 | WO9818931 | WO9818930 | WO9818928 | WO9858668 | WO9924578 | WO9927109 | WO9936544 | US5936076 | WO9953940 | WO9957280 | WO9958562 | WO0006737 | WO0006738 | WO0010599 | WO0012689 | WO0012131 | WO0033882 | WO0037105 | WO0037494 | WO0056360 | WO0058475 | WO0061761 | WO0076540 | WO0112219 | WO0170955 | WO0172337 | WO0181380 | WO0202606 | WO0208426 | WO0218595 | WO0222167 | WO0222168 | WO0234773 | WO0234771 | WO02059148 | WO02077183 | WO02079241 | WO02079243 | WO02091998 | WO02094851 | WO02094868 | WO02102829 | WO03011899 | WO03011223 | WO03049762 | WO03068811 | WO03082183 | WO03093306 | WO03097091 | WO03104272 | WO03105769 | US6699703 | WO2004041157 | US6800744 | WO2004092360 | WO2004092209 | WO2005002619 | WO2005032582 | WO2005079315 | US2005192248 | US6945952 | US2005215517 | WO2005102049 | WO2006032475 | WO2006032472 | WO2006032500 | WO2007000343 | US7182747 | WO2007030477 | WO2007040840 | US7211062 | WO2007053455 | WO2007059289 | WO2007061964 | WO2007113222 | WO2007113223 | WO2007113224 | WO2007116322 | WO2007120362 | WO2007124393 | WO2007127976 | WO2008005555 | WO2008019162 | WO2008047174 | WO2008047249 | WO2009040548 | WO2009067081 | US2009182306 | WO2009111337 | WO2009118296 | WO2010014913 | US2010143301 | EP2289843 | WO2011049677 | US2011112509 | WO2011119759 | WO2012031140 | - REAP ET AL., VACCINE, (2007), vol. 25, pages 7441 - 7449 | - LEMIEUX ET AL., INFECT. IMM., (2006), vol. 74, pages 2453 - 2456 | - HOSKINS ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (2001), vol. 183, pages 5709 - 5717 | - ADAMOU ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (2001), vol. 69, no. 2, pages 949 - 958 | - BRILES ET AL., J. INFECT. DIS., (2000), vol. 182, pages 1694 - 1701 | - TALKINGTON ET AL., MICROB. PATHOG., (1996), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 17 - 22 | - BETHE ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (2001), vol. 205, no. 1, pages 99 - 104 | - BROWN ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (2001), vol. 69, pages 6702 - 6706 | - WHALEN ET AL., FEMS IMMUNOL. MED. MICROBIOL., (2005), vol. 43, pages 73 - 80 | - JOMAA ET AL., VACCINE, (2006), vol. 24, no. 24, pages 5133 - 5139 | - DALE, VACCINE, (1999), vol. 17, pages 193 - 200 | - DALE, VACCINE, vol. 14, no. 10, pages 944 - 948 | - ZHU ET AL., VACCINE, (2004), vol. 22, pages 660 - 669 | - PRICE ET AL., INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (2004), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 277 - 283 | - PLANTE, J INFECTIOUS DISEASE, (2000), vol. 182, pages 848 - 855 | - PRAUSNITZ ET AL., CURR TOP MICROBIOLIMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 333, pages 369 - 93 | - KANG ET AL., EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2012), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 547 - 60 | - DAVIDSON ET AL., CHEMICAL ENGINEERING RESEARCH AND DESIGN, (2008), vol. 86, pages 1196 - 1206 | - CAREY ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 7, page E22442 | - BAL ET AL., J CONTROL RELEASE, (2010), vol. 147, pages 218 - 24 | - DONNELLY ET AL., PHARM RES, (2011), vol. 28, pages 41 - 57 | - KOUTSONANOS ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2009), vol. 4, no. E, page E4773 | - QUAN ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2009), vol. 4, no. 9, page E7152 | - MATSUO ET AL., J CONTROL RELEASE, (2012), vol. 161, pages 10 - 17 | - LEE ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2008), vol. 29, no. 13, pages 2113 - 24 | - SULLIVAN ET AL., NATURE MED, (2010), vol. 16, pages 915 - 920 | - OH ET AL., 2006 Annual Meeting and Exposition. TheAAPSJournal, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENTISTS, (2006), vol. 8, page 2 | - MATSUO ET AL., J CONTROL RELEASE, (2012), vol. 160, no. 3, pages 495 - 501 | - KOUTSONANOS ET AL., SCI REP., (2012), vol. 2, page 357 | - GILL; PRAUSNITZ, J CONTROL RELEASE, (2007), vol. 117, pages 227 - 37 | - JIN ET AL., BIOMED MICRODEVICES, (2009), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 1195 - 203 | - VRDOLJAK ET AL., J CONTROL RELEASE, (2012), vol. 159, pages 34 - 42 | - ROSENBERG ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2010), vol. 184, page 136.20 | - MYERS ET AL., CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR ASPECTS OF ENDOTOXIN REACTIONS, (1990), pages 145 - 156 | - JOHNSON ET AL., JMED CHEM, (1999), vol. 42, pages 4640 - 9 | - BALDRICK ET AL., REGULATORY TOXICOL PHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 35, pages 398 - 413 | - COLER ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 1, page E16333 | - JOHNSON ET AL., BIOORG MED CHEM LETT, (1999), vol. 9, pages 2273 - 2278 | - EVANS ET AL., EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 219 - 229 | - BAZIN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT, (2006), vol. 47, pages 2087 - 92 | - WONG ET AL., J CLIN PHARMACOL, (2003), vol. 43, no. 7, pages 735 - 42 | - DE LIBERO ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS IMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 5, pages 485 - 496 | - OKI ET AL., J. CLIN. INVESTIG., vol. 113, pages 1631 - 1640 | - YANG ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2004), vol. 43, pages 3818 - 3822 | - GOFF ET AL., J. AM. CHEM., SOC., (2004), vol. 126, pages 13602 - 13603 | - PEPPOLONI ET AL., EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2003), vol. 2, pages 285 - 93 | - DA HORA ET AL., VACCINE, (2011), vol. 29, pages 1538 - 44 | - PIZZA ET AL., INT JMED MICROBIAL, (2000), vol. 290, pages 455 - 61 | - FENG ET AL., ACTA BIOCHIM BIOPHYS SIN (SHANGHAI)., (2005), vol. 37, no. 2, pages 126 - 32 | - TREANOR ET AL., J INFECT DIS, (1996), vol. 173, pages 1467 - 70 | - KEITEL ET AL., CLIN DIAGN LAB IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 3, pages 507 - 10 | - GIULIANI ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2006), vol. 103, pages 10834 - 9 | - CASSONE; TOROSANTUCCI, EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2006), vol. 5, pages 859 - 67 | - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (200201), page 453077 | - FALUGI ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 31, pages 3816 - 3824 | - BARALDO ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (2004), vol. 72, no. 8, pages 4884 - 7 | - RUAN ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (1990), vol. 145, pages 3379 - 3384 | - KUO ET AL., INFECT IMMUN, (1995), vol. 63, pages 2706 - 13 | - MICHON ET AL., VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 1732 - 41 | - MOL. IMMUNOL., (1985), vol. 22, pages 907 - 919 | - BETHELL G.S. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1979), vol. 254, pages 2572 - 4 | - HEAM M.T.W., J. CHROMATOGR., (1981), vol. 218, pages 509 - 18 | - GEVER ET AL., MED. MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL, (1979), vol. 165, pages 171 - 288 | - TRITTO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 179, pages 5346 - 5357 |