EP2950783 - ARTIFICIAL TEARS COMPRISING SODIUM HYALURONATE AND CARBOXYMETHYLCELLULOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEARD, Bereth J. 2341 Azure Avenue Newport Beach, California 92660 / US | 02 /
BLANDA, Wendy M. 158 N. B Street Tustin, California 92780 / US | 03 /
MARSH, David A. 1190 Spectrum Irvine, California 92618 / US | 04 /
SIMMONS, Peter A. 16611 Camille Place Yorba Linda, California 92886 / US | 05 /
VEHIGE, Joseph G. 28386 La Pradera Laguna Niguel, California 92677 / US | 06 /
HAIXIA, Liu 25 Palatine 320 Irvine, California 92612 / US | 07 /
MATSUMOTO, Steven S. 201 W. Avenida Cordoba San Clemente, California 92672 / US | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/50] | Application number, filing date | 14704747.6 | 03.02.2014 | [2015/50] | WO2014US14505 | Priority number, date | US201361759710P | 01.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361759710 P | US201361785857P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361785857 P | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014121232 | Date: | 07.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2950783 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2950783 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10, A61K47/36, A61K47/38 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
A61K9/0048 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,RU,US);
A61K31/728 (US);
A61K31/047 (US);
A61K31/205 (US);
A61K31/717 (US);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K47/12 (US);
A61K47/38 (EP,RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜNSTLICHE TRÄNEN ENTHALTEND NATRIUMHYALURONAT UND CARBOXYMETHYLCELLULOSE | [2019/01] | English: | ARTIFICIAL TEARS COMPRISING SODIUM HYALURONATE AND CARBOXYMETHYLCELLULOSE | [2015/50] | French: | LARMES ARTIFICIELLES COMPRENANT HYALURONATE SODIUM ET CARBOXYMETHYL CELLULOSE | [2019/01] |
Former [2015/50] | KÜNSTLICHE TRÄNEN MIT NATRIUMHYALURONAT UND CARBOXYMETHYLCELLULOSE | ||
Former [2015/50] | LARMES ARTIFICIELLES COMPORTANT DE L'HYALURONATE DE SODIUM ET DE LA CARBOXYMÉTHYLCELLULOSE | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 11.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19151359.7 / EP3517100 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004137079 (COOK JAMES N [US], et al); | [XY]EP1992362 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]); | [XY]WO2009157596 (DHP KOREA LTD CO [KR], et al); | [Y]WO2010047927 (ALLERGAN INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US5017229 | US6472379 | US2010086512 |