EP3100005 - OPTICAL DISTRIBUTED SENSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MEASUREMENTS OVER EXTENDED RANGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omnisens S.A. Riond-Bosson 3 1110 Morges / CH | [2016/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROCHAT, Etienne Ancienne Post 33 CH-1412 Valeyres sous Ursins / CH | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Pontet Allano & Associes Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint-Aubin 91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 14705291.4 | 27.01.2014 | [2016/49] | WO2014EP51515 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015110177 | Date: | 30.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3100005 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/353 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
G01D5/35383 (EP);
G01D5/35364 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] | Title | German: | OPTISCH VERTEILTE MESSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR MESSUNGEN ÜBER ERWEITERTE BEREICHE | [2016/49] | English: | OPTICAL DISTRIBUTED SENSING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MEASUREMENTS OVER EXTENDED RANGES | [2016/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION OPTIQUE DISTRIBUÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE SUR DES PLAGES ÉTENDUES | [2016/49] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/49] | 24.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 11.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2012050735 (HIGGINS RICHARD J [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,16 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0102]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 1-16; | [XYI]US2012281201 (BROWN ANTHONY [CA]) [X] 1-3,12,16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0016]; figure 9 * [Y] 1-16 [I] 10,11; | [XY]US7157693 (THINGBO DAG [NO] ET AL) [X] 1-3,16 * the whole document * [Y] 4-15; | [XY]GB2284256 (SENSOR DYNAMICS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,16 * abstract * [Y] 4-15; | [Y] - DAKIN J P ET AL, "REVIEW ARTICLE; Multiplexed and distributed optical fibre sensor systems", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, IOP PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (19870801), vol. 20, no. 8, doi:10.1088/0022-3735/20/8/002, ISSN 0022-3735, pages 954 - 967, XP020018611 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3735/20/8/002 | by applicant | US2012224182 |