EP2957118 - SMART WIFI ACCESS POINT THAT SELECTS THE BEST CHANNEL FOR WIFI CLIENTS HAVING MULTI-RADIO CO-EXISTENCE PROBLEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOTA, Sudheep K. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
HOU, Jason 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
MALKIN, Yoseph 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2015/52] | Application number, filing date | 14705641.0 | 31.01.2014 | [2015/52] | WO2014US14069 | Priority number, date | US201313766700 | 13.02.2013 Original published format: US201313766700 | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014126729 | Date: | 21.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2957118 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/14, H04W88/08 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04W16/14 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTER WIFI-ZUGANGSPUNKT ZUR AUSWAHL DES BESTEN KANALS FÜR WIFI-CLIENTS MIT MEHRFUNKKOEXISTENZPROBLEMEN | [2015/52] | English: | SMART WIFI ACCESS POINT THAT SELECTS THE BEST CHANNEL FOR WIFI CLIENTS HAVING MULTI-RADIO CO-EXISTENCE PROBLEMS | [2015/52] | French: | POINT D'ACCÈS WIFI INTELLIGENT SÉLECTIONNANT LE MEILLEUR CANAL POUR DES CLIENTS WIFI AYANT DES PROBLÈMES DE COEXISTENCE MULTIRADIO | [2015/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 23.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002098870 (KASHIWAGI KENJI [JP], et al); | [XI]US2004157613 (STEER DAVID [CA], et al); | [XI]US2004166852 (BACKERS FLOYD [US], et al); | [XI]US2013016221 (CHARBIT GILLES [GB], et al); |