EP2954566 - LED MODULE WITH HERMETIC SEAL OF WAVELENGTH CONVERSION MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumileds Holding B.V. The Base, Tower B5 unit 107 Evert van de Beekstraat 1 1118 CL Schiphol / NL | [2019/09] |
Former [2018/31] | For all designated states Lumileds Holding B.V. WTC Schiphol, Tower G4 Schiphol Boulevard 127 1118 BG Schiphol / NL | ||
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMIZU, Kentaro c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MORAN, Brendan, Jude c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BUTTERWORTH, Mark, Melvin c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
SHCHEKIN, Oleg, Borisovich c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/51] | Representative(s) | Rüber, Bernhard Jakob Lumileds Germany GmbH Intellectual Property Philipsstraße 8 52068 Aachen / DE | [2015/51] | Application number, filing date | 14705885.3 | 10.02.2014 | [2015/51] | WO2014IB58875 | Priority number, date | US201361763081P | 11.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361763081 P | [2015/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014122626 | Date: | 14.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2954566 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2954566 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/50, H01L33/48, // H01L33/58 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
H01L33/486 (EP,US);
H01L25/0753 (US);
H01L33/50 (EP,US);
H01L33/501 (US);
H01L33/505 (US);
H01L33/54 (US);
H01L33/62 (US);
H01L33/642 (US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/51] | H01L33/50, H01L33/48 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-MODUL MIT HERMETISCHER DICHTUNG AUS WELLENLÄNGENUMWANDLUNGSMATERIAL | [2015/51] | English: | LED MODULE WITH HERMETIC SEAL OF WAVELENGTH CONVERSION MATERIAL | [2015/51] | French: | MODULE DE DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE (DEL) AYANT UN JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ HERMÉTIQUE POUR SCELLER LE MATÉRIAU DE CONVERSION DE LONGUEUR D'ONDE | [2019/45] |
Former [2015/51] | MODULE DE DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE (DEL) AYANT UN JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ HERMÉTIQUE DE MATIÈRE DE CONVERSION DE LONGUEUR D'ONDE | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/51] | 04.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.10.2019 | 09.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2014 | AL | 08.04.2020 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | IT | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 10.02.2014 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MK | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 10.02.2014 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 10.02.2014 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003189217 (IMAI SADATO [JP]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0018]; figure 4; claim 1 *; | [YA]US2008029774 (SHISHOV ALEXANDER VALERIEVICH [RU], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0037]; figures 1, 2 *[A] 7; | [Y]US2011193105 (LERMAN LOUIS [US], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0231] - [0232]; figure 20 * * paragraphs [0212] - [0213] *; | [XY]US2012034716 (LIN SHEN-BO [TW]) [X] 1-4,8,10-12,14 * paragraphs [0017] - [0023] - [0 25]; figures 1,2, 6,9; claim 1 * [Y] 5,6,9,13,15; | [Y]US2012133268 (HWU JON-FWU [TW], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 24]; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO2013001687 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0044]; figure 3 * | Examination | US2007152229 | JP2007243052 | US2014103798 |