EP3107986 - WASHING OR CLEANING COMPOSITION HAVING IMPROVED FOAMING CHARACTERISTICS WITH A HIGH LEVEL OF SOILING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIEDEL, Peter Am Dammsteg 44 40591 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
HEBERLEIN, Walter Fallgasse 1/15 1060 Wien / AT | 03 /
PANZICA, Danilo Walter-Wiederholt Strasse 7a 40721 Hilden / DE | 04 /
PATIL, Ketan Opposite Sai Garden Hoskote Main Road Whitefield Bangalore Karnataka 566067 / IN | 05 /
NICKEL, Dieter Adolph-von-Menzel Str. 35 50259 Pulheim / DE | 06 /
KRAUS, Ingrid Grünberger Weg 20 40627 Düsseldorf / DE | 07 /
KLEINSCHNITZ, Robin Heiligenhauserstr. 31 40599 Düsseldorf / DE | 08 /
WENK, Hans-Henning Westminsterstr. 47 45470 Mühlheim / DE | 09 /
KUPPERT, Dirk Ludwigallee 10 63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | 10 /
LATTICH, Jürgen Neugasse 41 61130 Nidderau / DE | 11 /
MARZOUK, Ashraf Henkel Jebel Ali FZCO High Bay Building Office FF26 Dubai Silicon Oasis 341044 Dubai / AE | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 14706532.0 | 20.02.2014 | [2016/52] | WO2014EP53333 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015124189 | Date: | 27.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107986 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/65, C11D1/94, C11D3/00, C11D1/22, C11D1/90 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
C11D3/0094 (EP,US);
C11D1/22 (EP,RU,US);
C11D1/90 (EP,RU,US);
C11D1/94 (EP,RU,US);
C11D17/06 (US);
C11D3/00 (RU);
C11D2111/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Title | German: | WASCH- ODER REINIGUNGSMITTEL MIT VERBESSERTEM SCHAUMVERHALTEN UNTER HOHER SCHMUTZBELASTUNG | [2016/52] | English: | WASHING OR CLEANING COMPOSITION HAVING IMPROVED FOAMING CHARACTERISTICS WITH A HIGH LEVEL OF SOILING | [2016/52] | French: | LESSIVES OU DÉTERGENTS AYANT UN COMPORTEMENT DE MOUSSAGE AMÉLIORÉ EN CAS DE FORTES SALISSURES | [2016/52] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/52] | 07.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/52] | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0711545 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]); | [A]US6506719 (ARVANITIDOU EVANGELIA S [US], et al); | [A]DE10162648 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [AD]EP1739161 (KAO CHEMICALS GMBH [DE]) |