EP2965304 - METHOD AND DEVICE ARRANGEMENT FOR INDIVIDUAL AUTOMATED TRAFFIC CONTROL OF ROAD USERS AT AN AIRPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraport AG Frankfurt Airport Services Worldwide 60547 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIETEN, Björn, Daniel Am Sprunk 1 55299 Nackenheim / DE | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2016/02] | Application number, filing date | 14707761.4 | 03.03.2014 | [2016/02] | WO2014EP54095 | Priority number, date | DE201310102073 | 04.03.2013 Original published format: DE102013102073 | [2016/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014135500 | Date: | 12.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2965304 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G08G5/00, G08G5/06 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
G08G5/0013 (EP);
G08G5/0021 (EP);
G08G5/0026 (EP);
G08G5/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUR INDIVIDUELLEN AUTOMATISIERTEN VERKEHRSFÜHRUNG VON VERKEHRSTEILNEHMERN AN EINEM FLUGHAFEN | [2016/02] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE ARRANGEMENT FOR INDIVIDUAL AUTOMATED TRAFFIC CONTROL OF ROAD USERS AT AN AIRPORT | [2016/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DISPOSITIF POUR LE GUIDAGE AUTOMATISÉ INDIVIDUEL D'USAGERS DES VOIES DE CIRCULATION SUR UN AÉROPORT | [2016/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 19.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.04.2019 | 19.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/32] | 29.03.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 09.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2009150013 (FINN PETER G [CA] ET AL) [X] 1-3,8,11-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 31] - [0032] - [0036] , [0 44] , [0 47] , [0051] , [0 52] , [0 57] , [0 58] , [0 59] , [0 60] * [I] 4-7,14-16; | [X]US3706969 (PAREDES CANDELARIO) [X] 1,3,8-10,12,17 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 15; figures 1-4 *; | [AD]WO2006070207 (CORRIGAN NIGEL [GB]) [AD] 1-17 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 28 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 20; figure 1 * * page 8, lines 1-22 *; | [X]US2003009278 (MALLET ROBERT [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,8-10,12,13,17 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] - [0 33] - [0036] - [0 38] , [0 39] , [0041] *; | [A]US2012245836 (WHITE THOMAS [US] ET AL) [A] 1,13 * paragraphs [0023] , [0 24] , [0 48] , [0 49] , [0 97] * | Examination | US2005140540 |