EP2976272 - SAFETY ENVELOPE CAPABLE OF PROVIDING PROTECTION AGAINST OPENING OF RECEPTACLES, OBJECT COVERED WITH AN ENVELOPE OF THIS TYPE AND METHOD FOR AFFIXING INFORMATION ON AN ENVELOPE OF THIS TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sleever International Company 15 avenue Arago 91420 Morangis / FR | [2016/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRESNEL, Eric 1 impasse du Moulin Vert F-75014 Paris / FR | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | Decorchemont, Audrey Véronique Christèle, et al Cabinet Boettcher 5, rue de Vienne 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | Decorchemont, Audrey Véronique Christèle, et al CABINET BOETTCHER 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 14707797.8 | 04.03.2014 | [2016/04] | WO2014EP54187 | Priority number, date | FR20130052425 | 19.03.2013 Original published format: FR 1352425 | [2016/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014146899 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2976272 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2976272 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65D55/08 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
B65D55/0854 (EP,RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSHÜLLE ZUM SCHUTZ GEGEN DAS ÖFFNEN VON BEHÄLTERN, MIT EINER DERARTIGEN HÜLLE BEDECKTES OBJEKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANBRINGUNG VON INFORMATIONEN AN EINER DERARTIGEN HÜLLE | [2016/04] | English: | SAFETY ENVELOPE CAPABLE OF PROVIDING PROTECTION AGAINST OPENING OF RECEPTACLES, OBJECT COVERED WITH AN ENVELOPE OF THIS TYPE AND METHOD FOR AFFIXING INFORMATION ON AN ENVELOPE OF THIS TYPE | [2016/04] | French: | ENVELOPPE DE SECURITE APTE A ASSURER UNE PROTECTION ANTI-OUVERTURE DE RECIPIENTS, OBJET RECOUVERT D'UNE TELLE ENVELOPPE ET PROCEDE D'INSCRIPTION D'INFORMATIONS SUR UNE TELLE ENVELOPPE | [2016/04] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 06.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2014 | AL | 22.02.2017 | AT | 22.02.2017 | CY | 22.02.2017 | CZ | 22.02.2017 | DK | 22.02.2017 | EE | 22.02.2017 | FI | 22.02.2017 | HR | 22.02.2017 | LT | 22.02.2017 | LV | 22.02.2017 | MC | 22.02.2017 | MK | 22.02.2017 | MT | 22.02.2017 | RO | 22.02.2017 | RS | 22.02.2017 | SE | 22.02.2017 | SI | 22.02.2017 | SK | 22.02.2017 | SM | 22.02.2017 | TR | 22.02.2017 | IE | 04.03.2017 | LU | 04.03.2017 | BG | 22.05.2017 | NO | 22.05.2017 | IS | 22.06.2017 | PT | 22.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 04.03.2014 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
TR | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 04.03.2014 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MK | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 04.03.2014 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CY | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.03.2014 | |
AT | 22.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
MT | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SI | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
IE | 04.03.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
LU | 04.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
SM | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
DK | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
MC | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
EE | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RO | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
SK | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
CZ | 22.02.2017 | ||
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 22.02.2017 | |
FI | 22.02.2017 | ||
HR | 22.02.2017 | ||
LT | 22.02.2017 | ||
LV | 22.02.2017 | ||
RS | 22.02.2017 | ||
SE | 22.02.2017 | ||
BG | 22.05.2017 | ||
NO | 22.05.2017 | ||
PT | 22.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2006123917 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1,15,16 * abstract *; | [A]FR2598389 (SCHEIDEGGER ALBERT [FR]) [A] 1,15,16 * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9319445 (TRIGON IND LTD [NZ]) [A] 1,15,16 * page 3, paragraph l - page 4, paragraph 1; figure 1 * |