EP2956547 - USE OF AXMI184 FOR THE CONTROL OF ROOTWORM INSECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Athenix Corp. 3500 Paramount Parkway Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCNULTY, Brian 15941 Quiet Oak Road Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 02 /
STAUFFER, Maria 1028 Rolling Knoll Road Apex, NC 27523 / US | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2015/52] | Power, David J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14707888.5 | 12.02.2014 | [2015/52] | WO2014US15997 | Priority number, date | US201361764246P | 13.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361764246 P | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014126986 | Date: | 21.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2956547 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2956547 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C07K14/325 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
C07K14/325 (EP,US);
A01N63/50 (EP,US);
C12N15/8286 (EP,US);
Y02A40/146 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N63/50, A01N63/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON AXMI184 ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON MAISWURZELBOHRERN | [2015/52] | English: | USE OF AXMI184 FOR THE CONTROL OF ROOTWORM INSECTS | [2015/52] | French: | UTILISATION D'AXMI184 POUR LA LUTTE CONTRE DES LARVES NUISIBLES AUX RACINES | [2015/52] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 22.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 15.03.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.05.2018 | AT | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | FI | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | NL | 02.05.2018 | PL | 02.05.2018 | RS | 02.05.2018 | SE | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | TR | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | NO | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | PT | 03.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/31] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9957128 (MAXYGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6; | [I]WO03075655 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010003065 (ATHENIX CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-6; | [A] - JUN FANG ET AL, "Characterization of chimeric Bacillus thuringiensis Vip3 toxins", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, vol. 73, no. 3, doi:10.1128/AEM.02079-06, ISSN 0099-2240, (20070201), pages 956 - 961, URL: http://aem.asm.org/content/73/3/956, (20061101), XP002670816 [A] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.02079-06 | by applicant | US4196265 | US4945050 | WO9100915 | US5039523 | EP0480762 | US5380831 | US5436391 | US5605793 | US5743477 | US5837458 | US2001026941 | US2002015066 | US6468523 | US2009137409 | US2010004176 | - CARRIERE ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2003), vol. 100, pages 1519 - 1523 | - CATTANEO ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2006), vol. 103, pages 7571 - 7576 | - HUANG ET AL., SCIENCE, (2005), vol. 308, pages 688 - 690 | - WU, SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, pages 1676 - 1678 | - HUTCHISON ET AL., SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 330, pages 222 - 225 | - GOULD F, ANNU REV ENTOMOL, (1998), vol. 43, pages 701 - 72 | - GRAY ET AL., ANNU REV ENTOMOL, (2009), vol. 54, pages 303 - 321 | - MEINKE ET AL., J ECON ENTOMOL, (1998), vol. 91, pages 594 - 600 | - PARIMI ET AL., J ECON ENTOMOL, (2006), vol. 25, pages 269 - 274 | - LEVINE ET AL., AM ENTOMOL, (2002), vol. 48, pages 94 - 107 | - GASSMANN ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 7, page E22629 | - CZAPLA; LANG, J. ECON. ENTOMOL., (1990), vol. 83, pages 2480 - 2485 | - ANDREWS ET AL., BIOCHEM. J., (1988), vol. 252, pages 199 - 206 | - MARRONE ET AL., J. OF ECONOMIC ENTOMOLOGY, (1985), vol. 78, pages 290 - 293 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, page 2264 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, page 403 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, page 3389 | - HIGGINS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - MYCRS; MILLER, CABIOS, (1988), vol. 4, pages 11 - 17 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, no. 3, pages 443 - 453 | - CZAPLA; LANG, ECON. ENTOMOL., (1990), vol. 83, pages 2480 - 2485 | - ANDREWS ET AL., BIOCHEM. J, (1988), vol. 252, pages 199 - 206 | - MARRONE ET AL., J OFECONOMIC ENTOMOLOGY, (1985), vol. 78, pages 290 - 293 | - MEINKOTH; WAHL, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 138, pages 267 - 284 | - MARRONE ET AL., OFECONOMIC ENTOMOLOGY, (1985), vol. 78, pages 290 - 293 | - ANDREWS ET AL., BIOCHEM..J., (1988), vol. 252, pages 199 - 206 | - MARRONE ET AL., J. OFECONOMIC ENTOMOLOGY, (1985), vol. 78, pages 290 - 293 | - SCHNEPF ET AL., MICROBIOL. MOL. BIOL. REV., (1998), vol. 62, pages 775 - 806 | - STEMMER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 10747 - 10751 | - STEMMER, NATURE, (1994), vol. 370, pages 389 - 391 | - CRAMERI ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH., (1997), vol. 15, pages 436 - 438 | - MOORE ET AL., J MOL. BIOL., (1997), vol. 272, pages 336 - 347 | - ZHANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (199709), vol. 94, pages 4504 - 4509 | - CRAMERI ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 288 - 291 | - NAIMOV ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (2001), vol. 67, pages 5328 - 5330 | - MAAGD ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1996), vol. 62, pages 1537 - 1543 | - GE ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 17954 - 17958 | - SCHNCPF ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 20923 - 20930 | - RANG ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1999), vol. 65, pages 2918 - 2925 | - CHANG, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 153, pages 507 - 516 | - HELLENS; MULLINEAUX, TRENDS IN PLANT SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 5, pages 446 - 451 | - GUERINEAU ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1991), vol. 262, pages 141 - 144 | - PROUDFOOT, CELL, (1991), vol. 64, pages 671 - 674 | - SANFACON ET AL., GENES DEV., (1991), vol. 5, pages 141 - 149 | - MOGEN ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, pages 1261 - 1272 | - MUNROE ET AL., GENE, (1990), vol. 91, pages 151 - 158 | - BALLAS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 7891 - 7903 | - JOSHI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1987), vol. 15, pages 9627 - 9639 | - CAMPBELL; GOWRI, PLANT PHYSIOL., (1990), vol. 92, pages 1 - 11 | - MURRAY ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 477 - 498 | - HEIJNE ET AL., PLANTMOL. BIOL. REP., (1991), vol. 9, pages 104 - 126 | - CLARK ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 264, pages 17544 - 17550 | - DELLA-CIOPPA ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOL., (1987), vol. 84, pages 965 - 968 | - ROMER ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1993), vol. 196, pages 1414 - 1421 | - SHAH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 233, pages 478 - 481 | - HIEI ET AL., THE PLANT JOURNAL, (1994), vol. 6, pages 271 - 282 | - ISHIDA ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 745 - 750 | - AYRES; PARK, CRITICAL REVIEWS IN PLANT SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 13, pages 219 - 239 | - BOMMINENI; JAUHAR, MAYDICA, (1997), vol. 42, pages 107 - 120 | - SVAB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 8526 - 8530 | - SVAB; MALIGA, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 913 - 917 | - SVAB; MALIGA, EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 601 - 606 | - MCBRIDE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 7301 - 7305 | - MCCORMICK ET AL., PLANT CELL REPORTS, (1986), vol. 5, pages 81 - 84 | - STALKER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 263, pages 6310 - 6314 | - SATHASIVAN ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 2188 | - ESTRUCH ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 5389 - 5394 | - OLESON ET AL., J. ECON ENTOMOL., (2005), vol. 98, no. 1, pages 1 - 8 | - MILLER ET AL., PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (2001), vol. 127, pages 594 - 606 |