EP2959163 - ACTUATOR AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING AN ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synoste Oy Spektri Business Park Metsänneidonkuja 6 02130 Espoo / FI | [2018/28] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Synoste Oy Metsänneidonkuja 8 02130 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALLILA, Harri Gyldenintie 8 A 7 FI-00200 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
HAAJA, Juha Kiskottajankuja 4 C 34 FI-02660 Espoo / FI | 03 /
RITVANEN, Antti Mannerheimintie 31 B 26 FI-00250 Helsinki / FI | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14708075.8 | 18.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014FI50119 | Priority number, date | FI20130005175 | 22.02.2013 Original published format: FI 20135175 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014128349 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959163 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2959163 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F03G7/06, A61B17/66, A61B17/72 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
F03G7/065 (EP,US);
A61B17/7275 (FI);
A61B17/66 (US);
A61B17/7216 (EP,US);
F03G1/10 (EP,US);
A61B2017/681 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKTUATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINES AKTUATORS | [2016/01] | English: | ACTUATOR AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING AN ACTUATOR | [2016/01] | French: | ACTIONNEUR ET PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION D'UN ACTIONNEUR | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 21.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.02.2014 | AL | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | HR | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | MK | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | RS | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | SM | 11.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | PT | 11.11.2018 | LU | 18.02.2019 | MT | 18.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.02.2014 | |
AL | 11.07.2018 | ||
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
MT | 18.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
CY | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
MT | 18.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
PT | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
MT | 18.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
LU | 18.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5415660 (CAMPBELL MICHAEL P [US], et al) [Y] 7-11 * column 7, line 23 - column 9, line 6; figures 1,3,5 *; | [A]FR2726460 (MEDINOV SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 12, line 17 - page 13, line 29; figures 1,2 * * page 14, line 5 - page 16, line 18; figures 3-5 *; | [A]EP0919717 (FACHHOCHSCHULE KONSTANZ [DE]) [A] 14 * paragraphs [0026] - [0031]; figure 1 *; | [A]US6730087 (BUTSCH MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 14* the whole document *; | [XYI]US2009013684 (TAKAHASHI MASAYA [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,12,13 * paragraphs [0021] - [0030]; figures 1-2D * [Y] 7-11 [I] 3-5; | [Y]DE102007036359 (STORZ-IRION REGINA [DE]) [Y] 14-20 * paragraphs [0028] - [0031]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [AD]US2009076597 (DAHLGREN JONATHAN MICHEAL [CA], et al) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1A,8 *; | [AD]WO2009115645 (UNIV HELSINKI TECHNOLOGY [FI], et al) [AD] 1 * page 6, line 5 - page 8, line 14; figures 1A-1C,7 *; | [YD]EP2133566 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [YD] 14-20 * paragraphs [0013] - [0018]; figures 1A,1B * | by applicant | US2003032958 | US2009076597 | WO2009115645 | EP2133566 | WO2011148047 | US8361090 | US2013096586 | - AZFAL KHAN ET AL., SHAPE MEMORY ALLOY WIRES FOR ACTUATING POSITIONING SYSTEMS WITH ELASTIC BEARINGS, URL: http://www.aspe.net/publications/Annual 2005/POSTERS/2EQUIP/3DTE ST/1815.PDF | - AALSMA A M M; HEKMAN E E G; STAPERT, J W J L; GROOTENBOER H J, "The Design of A TiNi actuator in an intramedullary leg lengthening device", J. PHYS. IV FRANCE, (1997), vol. 7, no. C5, pages 627 - 631 | - AALSMA A M M; HEKMAN E E G; STAPER J; GROOTENBOER H, "A completely intramedullary leg lengthening device", PROC. OF THE 20TH ANN. INT. CONF. OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY SOCIETY, (1998), vol. 20, pages 5 2710 - 2713 | - BERTACCHINI 0 W; LAGOUDS D C; PATOOR E, "Thermomechanical transformation fatigue of TiNiCu SMA actuators under a corrosive environment - Part I", EXPERIMENTAL RESULTS INT J FATIGUE, (2009), pages 1571 - 1578 | - CHAU E T F; FRIEND C M; ALLEN D M; HORA J; WEBSTER J R, "A technical and economic appraisal of shape memory alloys for aerospace applications", MATER. SCI. ENG., (2006), vol. A 438, no. 440, pages 589 - 592 | - ELWALEED A K; MOHAMED N A; NOR M J; MUSTAFA M M, "A new concept of a linear smart actuator Sens", ACTUATORS, (2007), vol. A 135, pages 244 - 249 | - FUMAGALLI L; BUTERA F; CODA A, "SmartFlex NiTi wires for shape memory actuators", J. MATER. ENG. PERFORM., (2009), vol. 18, pages 691 - 695 | - KHEIRIKHAH M M; RABIEE S; EDALATA M E, "A Review of shape memory alloy actuators in robotics", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 6556, pages 206 - 217 | - KIM H; YOO Y; LEE J, "Development of a NiTi actuator using a two-way shape memory effect induced by compressive loading cycles Sens", ACTUATORS, A, (2008), vol. 148, pages 437 - 442 | - LAGOUDAS D C; MILLER D A; RONG L; KUMAR P K, "Thermomechanical fatigue of shape memory alloys Smart Mater", STRUCT., (2009), page 18 | - MAMMANO G S; DRAGONI E, "Functional fatigue of Ni-Ti shape memory wires under various loading conditions", INT J FATIGUE, (2012), URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijfatigue.2012.03.004 | - MERTMANN M; VERGANI G, "Design and application of shape memory actuators", EUR. PHYS. J. SPECIAL TOPICS, (2008), vol. 158, pages 221 - 230 |