EP2991864 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING HAPTIC INFORMATION FOR A DRIVER OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Guerickestr. 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2018/38] |
Former [2016/10] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESIER, Marco Kemeler Weg 9 65307 Bad Schwalbach / DE | 02 /
MUNTU, Matthias Breslauer Weg 7 65719 Hofheim / DE | 03 /
ROLL, Georg Ludwig Fulda Weg 7 60438 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
JÄGER, Jens Maulbeerweg 12 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2016/10] | Application number, filing date | 14708247.3 | 05.03.2014 | [2016/10] | WO2014EP54252 | Priority number, date | DE201310208068 | 02.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013208068 | DE201310222281 | 04.11.2013 Original published format: DE102013222281 | [2016/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014177307 | Date: | 06.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991864 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/04, B60T8/40 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
B60T8/4081 (EP,US);
B60T13/662 (EP,US);
B60T13/686 (EP,US);
B60T13/745 (EP,US);
B60T7/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HAPTISCHEN INFORMATION EINES FAHRERS EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS UND BREMSANLAGE | [2016/10] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING HAPTIC INFORMATION FOR A DRIVER OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND BRAKE SYSTEM | [2016/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INFORMATION HAPTIQUE D'UN CONDUCTEUR D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE | [2016/10] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 31.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 27.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2007018498 (NAKAZAWA CHIHARU [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0055] , [0056]; figures 3,9 * |