EP2962144 - GANGED FIBER OPTIC CONNECTOR ADAPTER MODULES AND ASSEMBLIES HAVING REINFORCEMENT MEMBERS AND STAGGERED FIBER OPTIC CONNECTOR ADAPTER PORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Optical Communications LLC 800 17th Street NW Hickory, NC 28601 / US | For all designated states Bradley, Mark Alan 3468 4th Street Blvd. NW Hickory, North Carolina 28601 / US | For all designated states Isenhour, Micah Colen 1008 Park Circle Lincolnton, North Carolina 28092 / US | For all designated states Knecht, Dennis M 4921 Elmhurst Drive Hickory, North Carolina 28601 / US | For all designated states Luther, James P. 2471 Rolling Ridge Drive Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADLEY, Mark Alan 3468 4th Street Blvd. NW Hickory, North Carolina 28601 / US | 02 /
ISENHOUR, Micah Colen 1008 Park Circle Lincolnton, North Carolina 28092 / US | 03 /
KNECHT, Dennis Michael 4921 Elmhurst Drive Hickory, North Carolina 28601 / US | 04 /
LUTHER, James Phillip 2471 Rolling Ridge Drive Hickory, North Carolina 28602 / US | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Sturm, Christoph Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14708764.7 | 24.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014US17992 | Priority number, date | US201361770677P | 28.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361770677 P | US201313795888 | 12.03.2013 Original published format: US201313795888 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014133955 | Date: | 04.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2962144 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/3825 (EP,US);
G02B6/3897 (US);
G02B6/00 (EP,US);
G02B6/44528 (EP);
G02B6/3879 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | GEKOPPELTE GLASFASERSTECKERADAPTERMODULE UND ANORDNUNGEN MIT VERSTÄRKUNGSELEMENTEN UND VERSETZTE ANSCHLÜSSE EINES GLASFASERSTECKERADAPTERS | [2016/01] | English: | GANGED FIBER OPTIC CONNECTOR ADAPTER MODULES AND ASSEMBLIES HAVING REINFORCEMENT MEMBERS AND STAGGERED FIBER OPTIC CONNECTOR ADAPTER PORTS | [2016/01] | French: | MODULES D'ADAPTATEUR DE CONNECTEUR DE FIBRES OPTIQUES JUXTAPOSÉES ET ENSEMBLES QUI UTILISENT DES ÉLÉMENTS DE RENFORCEMENT ET DES PORTS D'ADAPTATEUR DE CONNECTEUR DE FIBRES OPTIQUES EN QUINCONCE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9939229 (SIEMON CO [US]) [Y] 11,13* page 9, line 14 - page 10, line 6; figures 14-17 *; | [XAYI]JP2001290051 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,4,5,9,10,12,15,27 * abstract * [A] 2,3,6-8 [Y] 11,13 [I] 14 |